EP3624866 - BREAST PUMP AND FEEDING KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Think Green Ltd. Level 12, KPMG Centre 85 Alexandra Street Private Bag 3140 Waikato Mail Centre Hamilton 3204 / NZ | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Shu, Ting c/o - James&Wells Level 12 KPMG Centre 85 Alexandra Street, Private Bag 3140, Waikato Mail Centre Hamilton 3204 / NZ | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/13] | Application number, filing date | 18849393.6 | 30.11.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018NZ50171 | Priority number, date | NZ17737838 | 30.11.2017 Original published format: NZ 17737838 | [2020/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019108070 | Date: | 06.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3624866 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/06, A61J11/04, A61J9/08 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
A61M1/06 (EP,AU,US);
A61J11/0005 (EP);
A61J11/0065 (EP);
A61J11/008 (EP,AU,US);
A61J11/02 (EP,AU,US);
A61J11/04 (EP);
A61J11/045 (AU,US);
A61J9/005 (AU,US);
A61J9/006 (EP,AU,US);
A61J9/0623 (AU,US);
A61M1/062 (EP);
A61M1/064 (AU,US);
A61M1/068 (US);
A61M1/82 (EP,US);
A61J7/0023 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Title | German: | BRUSTPUMPE UND FÜTTERUNGSKIT | [2020/13] | English: | BREAST PUMP AND FEEDING KIT | [2020/13] | French: | TIRE-LAIT ET KIT D'ALIMENTATION | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 20.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0345694 (SIGNORINI ALBERTO) [A] 1-7,10-13* column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 11; figures 1-7 *; | [XI]US2012315353 (BECSI STEVE [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0043]; figures 1, 2 * [I] 5-7,13; | [XI]CN206652006U (WANG YAN) [X] 1-3,9-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0039]; figures 1-4 * [I] 5-7,13 | International search | [XY]CN2885269Y (LIU LONGJIANG [CN]) [X] 1-26 * English abstract and figure 1 English abstract and figure 1 * [Y] 27-44; | [XY]US2008167605 (TORVIK AASMUND [NO]) [X] 1-26 * abstract, figure 1 abstract, figure 1 * [Y] 27-44; | [Y]US2009120894 (KARIO BERNA [US], et al) [Y] 27-44 * abstract and figures 1-7 *; | [XY]CN201308664Y (XIAOXIA GUO [CN]) [X] 1-26 * English abstract and figure 1 English abstract and figure 1 * [Y] 27-44; | [A]US2012315353 (BECSI STEVE [US], et al) [A] 1 * English abstract and fig. 1 *; | [Y]CN203842055U (NINGBO COMPASS PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 38-39 * English abstract and fig. 2 *; | [A]US2015038945 (MCCABE JILL C [US]) [A] 1* English abstract and fig. 9 *; | [Y]US2015282652 (HONARVAR CAMERON [US], et al) [Y] 27-44 * abstract and fig. 1-9 *; | [Y]CN205163674U (TIANJIN KELIN MOLD TECHNIC CO LTD) [Y] 38-39 * English abstract and fig. 1 * | by applicant | EP0345694 | US2012315353 | CN206652006U |