EP3726580 - DISPLAY SUBSTRATE, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOE Technology Group Co., Ltd. No. 10 Jiuxianqiao Rd. Chaoyang District Beijing 100015 / CN | [2020/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Wenfeng No. 9 Dize Rd. BDA Beijing 100176 / CN | [2020/43] | Representative(s) | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2024/28] |
Former [2020/43] | Brötz, Helmut, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 18849394.4 | 17.08.2018 | [2020/43] | WO2018CN101020 | Priority number, date | CN201711318101 | 12.12.2017 Original published format: CN201711318101 | [2020/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019114310 | Date: | 20.06.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3726580 | Date: | 21.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3726580 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 20.06.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H10K59/122, H10K71/00, H10K59/80, H10K59/131 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
H10K59/1315 (EP);
H10K50/824 (US);
H10K59/122 (EP,US);
H10K59/173 (US);
H10K59/80522 (EP);
H10K71/00 (EP,US);
H10K71/60 (EP);
H10K2102/3026 (US);
H10K50/818 (US);
H10K59/80518 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/41] | H01L27/32, H01L51/56, H01L51/52 | ||
Former IPC [2020/43] | H01L27/32, H01L51/50, H01L51/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGESUBSTRAT, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/43] | English: | DISPLAY SUBSTRATE, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2020/43] | French: | SUBSTRAT D'AFFICHAGE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2020/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2019 | Translation filed | 04.03.2019 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2019 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2019 | Examination requested [2020/43] | 24.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2013299791 (HIRAKATA YOSHIHARU [JP], et al); | [Y]US2015001507 (KIM EUN-AH [KR], et al); | [Y]JP5791514B ; | [XAYI]US2016043161 (MIYAZAWA TOSHIO [JP]); | [A]US2017125507 (LEE JOONSUK [KR], et al) |