EP3668154 - CONFIGURATION METHOD AND CORRESPONDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Wenqi Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Ruobing Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LU, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Shuigen Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
TAN, Wei Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 06 /
FENG, Zhenni Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 18849582.4 | 15.08.2018 | [2020/25] | WO2018CN100647 | Priority number, date | CN201710786862 | 04.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710786862 | [2020/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019042132 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3668154 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3668154 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, H04W16/02, H04L41/044, H04L41/0806, H04L41/5051, // H04W88/18, H04W92/24 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H04L41/044 (EP);
H04W28/16 (CN,US);
H04L41/0806 (EP,US);
H04B7/0413 (US);
H04B7/0617 (US);
H04B7/0626 (US);
H04B7/0695 (US);
H04B7/0697 (US);
H04B7/088 (US);
H04B7/18504 (US);
H04B7/18506 (US);
H04L41/0893 (US);
H04L41/0895 (EP);
H04L41/40 (EP);
H04L41/5051 (EP,US);
H04W16/02 (EP,CN);
H04W16/14 (US);
H04W16/28 (US);
H04W24/02 (EP);
H04W36/13 (EP,CN,US);
H04W48/16 (US);
H04W8/18 (US);
H04W36/06 (US);
H04W84/06 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | H04W24/02, H04W28/16, // H04W16/02 | ||
Former IPC [2020/25] | H04W24/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONFIGURATIONSVERFAHREN UND ENTSPRECHENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2020/25] | English: | CONFIGURATION METHOD AND CORRESPONDING APPARATUS | [2020/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT | [2020/25] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2020 | Translation filed | 09.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/25] | 27.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | ES | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | IT | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | NL | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/16] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 05.10.2022 |