EP3677645 - MULTI-BLOCK COPOLYMER COMPOSITION OBTAINED BY MODIFICATION TREATMENT, AND FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeon Corporation 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | For all designated states National University Corporation Tokai National Higher Education and Research System 1, Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 464-8601 / JP | [2023/14] |
Former [2020/28] | For all designated states Zeon Corporation 6-2, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | ||
For all designated states National University Corporation Nagoya University 1, Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 464-8601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISOBE, Kousuke c/o ZEON CORPORATION 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | 02 /
HASHIMOTO, Sadaharu c/o ZEON CORPORATION 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | 03 /
NOZAWA, Atsushi c/o ZEON CORPORATION 6-2 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | 04 /
NORO, Atsushi c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION NAGOYA UNIVERSITY 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | 05 /
KAJITA, Takato c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION NAGOYA UNIVERSITY 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | 06 /
MATSUSHITA, Yushu c/o NATIONAL UNIVERSITY CORPORATION NAGOYA UNIVERSITY 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18850359.3 | 23.08.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018JP31200 | Priority number, date | JP20170167040 | 31.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017167040 | [2020/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019044660 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3677645 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L53/02, C08F8/32, C08F8/46, C08F297/04, C08J5/18, C08L23/00, C08L25/02, C08F287/00 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
C08F8/32 (EP);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08F297/04 (EP);
C08F297/08 (US);
C08F8/46 (EP);
C08L53/025 (EP);
C08F2420/00 (US);
C08F2500/26 (US);
C08J2325/08 (US);
C08J2353/02 (EP);
C08L2203/16 (EP);
C08L2205/025 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/32, C08F8/46, C08F297/04 (EP);
C08L53/025, C08L53/025 (EP);
C08L53/025, C08L53/02, C08L53/02 (EP);
C08L53/025, C08L53/02, C08L53/02, C08L53/02 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/28] | C08L53/02, C08F8/32, C08F8/46, C08F297/04, C08J5/18, C08L23/00, C08L25/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | DURCH MODIFIZIERUNGSBEHANDLUNG ERHALTENE MULTIBLOCKCOPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FILM | [2020/28] | English: | MULTI-BLOCK COPOLYMER COMPOSITION OBTAINED BY MODIFICATION TREATMENT, AND FILM | [2020/28] | French: | COMPOSITION DE COPOLYMÈRE À BLOCS MULTIPLES OBTENUE PAR TRAITEMENT DE MODIFICATION, ET FILM | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2020 | Translation filed | 27.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 16.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5483091 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM); | [X]JPS54146889 (KURARAY CO); | [X]GB2035331 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPS56115307 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPS56116702 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPS56120753 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPS6243411 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPS62181307 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [L]WO2018207683 (ZEON CORP [JP], et al); | EP3623396 [ ] (ZEON CORP [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JPH0379613 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]JPH10512912 [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]JPH11506978 [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]WO2007069521 (KURARAY CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * , & US 2009/0270556 A1, & EP 1961778 A1 & CN 101331162 A & KR 10-2008-0080543 A *; | [A]WO2009123089 (ZEON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * , & US 2011/0046307 A1, & EP 2264101 A1 & CN 101981121 A *; | [A]JP2012077158 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]WO2015099163 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]JP2016128622 (KRATON POLYMERS US LLC) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [PA]JP2018002862 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [PA] 1-7 * , *; | [PA]WO2018101366 (ZEON CORP [JP])[PA] 1-7 | by applicant | WO2009123089 | JP2012077158 | WO2015099163 | JP2016089099 | - Rubber Chem. Technol., (19720000), vol. 45, page 1295 |