EP3677549 - BLACK POWDER, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ube Exsymo Co., Ltd. 9-19 Nihonbashi-Tomizawacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0006 / JP | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYOSHI, Hidenori c/o UBE EXSYMO Co. Ltd. 9-19 Nihonbashi-Tomizawacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0006 / JP | 02 /
GOTOU, Kenta c/o UBE EXSYMO Co. Ltd. 9-19 Nihonbashi-Tomizawacho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0006 / JP | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 18851128.1 | 13.08.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018JP30227 | Priority number, date | JP20170166608 | 31.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017166608 | [2020/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019044480 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3677549 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/18, G02F1/1339 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
G02F1/13398 (EP);
C01B33/18 (EP,KR);
C01B33/182 (US);
C01B33/183 (US);
G02F1/1339 (KR);
G02F1/13392 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | SCHWARZPULVER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2020/28] | English: | BLACK POWDER, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2020/28] | French: | POUDRE NOIRE ET SA MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2020 | Translation filed | 24.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 23.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH03279209 (TOKUYAMA SODA KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * claim 1 * * pages 2,4 *; | [X]JPH1149953 (UBE NITTO KASEI CO) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * example 1 * * paragraphs [0041] , [0043] , [0044] *; | [I]JP2014114358 (UBE EXSYMO CO LTD) [I] 3 * abstract * * example 1 ** paragraphs [0044] - [0048] *; | [X] - KAMIYA K ET AL, "Distribution of carbon particles in carbon/SiO"2 glass composites made from CH"3Si(OC"2H"5)"3 by the sol-gel method", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PHYSICS PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 119, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0022-3093(90)90235-E, ISSN 0022-3093, (19900301), pages 14 - 20, (19900301), XP024059810 [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [Introduction] * * paragraph [02.1] * * page 18; figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3093(90)90235-E | International search | [A]JPS6389408 (CATALYSTS & CHEM IND CO) [A] 1-3 * , & US 4925704 A & EP 234816 A2 *; | [XA]JPH03279209 (TOKUYAMA SODA KK) [X] 1-2 * , claims, page 2, upper right column, lines 9-16, page 4, upper left column, lines 1-6, examples (Family: none) * [A] 3; | [A]JPH08183610 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-3 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014114358 (UBE EXSYMO CO LTD) [A] 1-3* (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2014115399 |