EP3677343 - SEALANT APPLICATION NOZZLE AND SEALANT APPLICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHAGI, Michinobu C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 02 /
GOTO, Takuya C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | 03 /
IKADA, Akira C/O MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD. 16-5 Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 18851517.5 | 23.07.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018JP27566 | Priority number, date | JP20170163367 | 28.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017163367 | [2020/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019044269 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3677343 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B05C1/02 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
B05C1/027 (EP,US);
B05C1/02 (US);
B05C11/10 (US);
F16B33/004 (EP);
F16B5/02 (EP);
B05C17/00 (EP);
B05C7/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | DICHTSTOFFAUFTRAGUNGSDÜSE UND DICHTSTOFFAUFTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/28] | English: | SEALANT APPLICATION NOZZLE AND SEALANT APPLICATION DEVICE | [2020/28] | French: | BUSE D'APPLICATION DE PRODUIT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION DE PRODUIT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2019 | Translation filed | 05.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 28.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6339357 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [X]US2013224390 (TSUCHIDA SHUZO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0044]; figure - *; | [X]WO9115305 (LIBBEY OWENS FORD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract *; | [A]US4302271 (INJERD WILLIAM G) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [XYA]JPS61178965U [X] 1, 4 * , * [Y] 1-2, 4 [A] 3; | [XY]JP2004296330 (TOSHIBA BATTERY) [X] 1-2, 4 * , * [Y] 1-2, 4; | [Y]JPH04506628 [Y] 1-2, 4 * , *; | [YA]JPH1170351 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1-2, 4 * , * [A] 3 | by applicant | JPS63130162 |