EP3657740 - MESSAGE FORWARDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New H3C Technologies Co., Ltd. 466 Changhe Road Binjiang District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310052 / CN | [2020/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Wenyu Room 211 Oriental Electronic BLD. No.2 Chuangye Road Shangdi Information Industry Base Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Jiajia Room 211 Oriental Electronic BLD. No.2 Chuangye Road Shangdi Information Industry Base Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2020/22] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [2023/51] |
Former [2020/22] | IPAZ Parc Les Algorithmes, Bâtiment Platon CS 70003 Saint-Aubin 91192 Gif-sur-Yvette Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18852037.3 | 30.08.2018 | [2020/22] | WO2018CN103321 | Priority number, date | CN201710763296 | 30.08.2017 Original published format: CN201710763296 | [2020/22] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019042372 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3657740 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3657740 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L45/745, H04L45/74, H04L45/24, H04L101/622 | [2023/32] | CPC: |
H04L45/245 (EP,US);
H04L45/24 (EP,CN);
H04L45/74 (EP,CN);
H04L45/745 (EP,CN);
H04L45/7453 (US);
H04L2101/622 (EP,CN);
Y02D30/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/26] | H04L12/707, H04L12/741, H04L29/12, H04L12/709 | ||
Former IPC [2020/22] | H04L12/707, H04L12/741, H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEITERLEITUNG VON NACHRICHTEN | [2020/22] | English: | MESSAGE FORWARDING | [2020/22] | French: | TRANSFERT DE MESSAGE | [2020/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2020 | Translation filed | 21.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/22] | 25.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2012068579 (EXTREME NETWORKS INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15* pages 5,6,11 - page 13; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [I]US2017085467 (FORD JEFFREY ALLEN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0022] - [0029] - [0036]; figures 1,2; claims 1,2 * | Examination | CN106936739 | US2019020601 |