EP3677654 - PAINT COMPOSITION FOR FORMING HARDCOAT LAYER, AND OPTICAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JGC Catalysts and Chemicals Ltd. 580, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 212-0013 / JP | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAI, Masatoshi c/o Kitakyushu Operation Center JGC CATALYSTS AND CHEMICALS LTD. 13-2 Kitaminato-machi Wakamatsu-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 808-0027 / JP | 02 /
SHIMIZU, Takehiro c/o Kitakyushu Operation Center JGC CATALYSTS AND CHEMICALS LTD. 13-2 Kitaminato-machi Wakamatsu-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 808-0027 / JP | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 18852170.2 | 28.08.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018JP31778 | Priority number, date | JP20170167410 | 31.08.2017 Original published format: JP 2017167410 | [2020/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019044838 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3677654 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/06, B32B27/00, B32B27/34, C09D5/02, C09D7/47, C09D7/61, C09D183/07, C09D183/04 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
C09D183/04 (EP);
C09D183/06 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/00 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,KR);
C09D5/02 (EP,KR);
C09D7/47 (EP,KR);
C09D7/61 (EP,KR);
C08G77/14 (EP);
C08G77/20 (EP);
C08K3/36 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D183/04, C08K3/36, C08K5/3155, C08K5/092 (EP);
C09D183/06, C08K3/36, C08K5/3155, C08K5/092 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/28] | C09D183/06, B32B27/00, B32B27/34, C09D5/02, C09D7/47, C09D7/61, C09D183/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | FARBZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HARTSCHICHT UND OPTISCHE KOMPONENTE | [2020/28] | English: | PAINT COMPOSITION FOR FORMING HARDCOAT LAYER, AND OPTICAL COMPONENT | [2020/28] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PEINTURE POUR FORMER UNE COUCHE DE REVÊTEMENT DUR ET COMPOSANT OPTIQUE | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2020 | Translation filed | 06.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 11.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]WO2007046357 (CATALYSTS & CHEM IND CO [JP], et al); | [A]US7978409 (TANAKA HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * example 2 * | International search | [Y]JPS62204201 (TOYO BOSEKI) [Y] 5-10 * , claims, page 1, lower right column lines 8-10 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH10332902 (NIPPON EE R C KK) [A] 1-10 * , claims, examples & US 6440568 Bl, claims, examples & WO 1998/054604 A1 & EP 922971 A1 & KR 10-2000-0029516 A & CN 1231031 A *; | [A]JP2008081710 (TOKAI KOGAKU KK) [A] 1-10 * , claims, examples & US 2008/0050601 A1, claims, examples & EP 1895333 A1 & CN 101134872 A *; | [A]JP2009197078 (JGC CATALYSTS & CHEMICALS LTD) [A] 1-10 * , claims, examples (Family: none) *; | [A]CN101955728 (XIANGDAO HUANG) [A] 1-10* , claims, examples (Family: none) *; | [A]KR20110084688 (COATEC INDUSTRY INC [KR]) [A] 1-10 * , claims, examples (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2011102502 (TOKAI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * , claims, examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012137636 (JGC CATALYSTS & CHEMICALS LTD) [A] 1-10 * , claims, examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015151489 (JGC CATALYSTS & CHEMICALS LTD) [A] 1-10 * , claims, examples (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2015163465 (HOYA LENS THAILAND LTD [TH], et al) [A] 1-10 * , claims, examples & US 2017/0139084 A1, claims, examples & EP 3136139 A1 & CN 106461814 A *; | [XY]JP2015193757 (JGC CATALYSTS & CHEMICALS LTD) [X] 1-2, 4, 6-9 * , claims, paragraphs [0001], [0008], [0025], [0080], examples (Family: none) * [Y] 5-10; | [Y]JP2016079286 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, et al) [Y] 5-10 * , claims, paragraphs [0001], [0068] (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2016088901 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * , claims, examples & US 2017/0240769 A1, claims, examples & EP 3228672 A1 & CA 2965610 A *; | [A]JP2016115927 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) [A] 1-10 * , paragraph [0074] & CN 105694652 A *; | [A]JP2016190769 (JGC CATALYSTS & CHEMICALS LTD) [A] 1-10 * , paragraph [0014] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH0455126 | WO2007046357 | JP2009197078 |