EP3675644 - FOOD COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING REDUCED-FLAVOR COCOA PRODUCT AS BULK FILLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Hershey Company 19 East Chocolate Avenue Hershey, PA 17033 / US | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ST. JOHN, James F. 1585 Brookline Drive Hummelstown Pennsylvania 17036 / US | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 18852454.0 | 31.08.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018US49207 | Priority number, date | US201762553272P | 01.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762553272 P | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019046785 | Date: | 07.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3675644 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/00, A23C15/12 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
A23G1/00 (EP);
A23G1/40 (US);
A23G1/0036 (US);
A23G1/46 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | NAHRUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT GESCHMACKSREDUZIERTEM KAKAOPRODUKT ALS MASSEFÜLLSTOFF | [2020/28] | English: | FOOD COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING REDUCED-FLAVOR COCOA PRODUCT AS BULK FILLER | [2020/28] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ALIMENTAIRES CONTENANT UN PRODUIT DE CACAO À SAVEUR RÉDUITE EN TANT QUE CHARGE EN VRAC | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 18.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2023 | Observations by third parties | 21.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2024 | Observations by third parties | 24.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3649302 (DAGGY ELMER E, et al); | [X]US4524086 (PLAYER KENNETH W [US], et al); | [X]EP1992232 (KRAFT FOODS R & D INC [US]) | International search | [A]US4952413 (LABARGE ROBERT G [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US6296891 (ZUMBE ALBERT [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * See the whole document. *; | [X]US2002034579 (BIEHL BOLE [DE], et al) [X] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0011], [0015], [0018]; examples 3-4; and claim 16. *; | [A]US2003224097 (NERI NAPOLEONE [IT]) [A] 1-20* See the whole document. *; | [A]WO2006047151 (SWEET SUE LLC [US]) [A] 1-20 * See the whole document. * | by applicant | US3649302 | US4524086 | US2002034579 | EP1992232 | other | JP2005261391 | WO2017005372 |