EP3678755 - SMALL DIAMETER TUBULAR POROUS FIBER FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Porex Corporation 500 Bohannon Road Fairburn, GA 30213 / US | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORRIS-ANASTASI, Nicole Elizabeth 3403 Moss Side Avenue Richmond, Virginia 23222 / US | 02 /
CLENDENNING, Michael Andrew 60 Bretts Bend Sharpsburg, Georgia 30277 / US | 03 /
SPENCER, Michael W. 10709 Old Squaws Lane Chesterfield, Virginia 23838 / US | 04 /
ZHOU, Qiang 15731 Moss Fire Court Moseley, Virginia 23120 / US | 05 /
MAO, Guoqiang 500 Bohannon Road Fairburn, Georgia 30213 / US | [2020/50] |
Former [2020/29] | 01 /
MORRIS-ANASTASI, Nicole Elizabeth 3403 Moss Side Avenue Richmond, Virginia 23222 / US | ||
02 /
CLENDENNING, Michael Andrew 60 Bretts Bend Sharpsburg, Georgia 30277 / US | |||
03 /
SPENCER, Michael W. 10709 Old Squaws Lane Chesterfield, Virginia 23838 / US | |||
04 /
ZHOU, Qiang 15731 Moss Fire Court Moseley, Virginia 23120 / US | |||
05 /
MAO, Guoqiang 338 N. Peachtree Parkway Peachtree City, Georgia 30269 / US | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/29] | Thompson, Andrew John Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18853488.7 | 07.09.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018US49865 | Priority number, date | US201762555136P | 07.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762555136 P | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019051171 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3678755 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/02, B01D46/10, B01D46/24, B01D39/16, B01D29/33, B01D29/35 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
B01D39/1623 (EP,US);
B01D29/03 (US);
B01D29/31 (US);
B01D29/33 (EP,US);
B01D29/35 (EP,US);
B01D46/2403 (EP,US);
B01D2201/18 (EP);
B01D2239/0233 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1216 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1233 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/29] | B01D39/02, B01D46/10, B01D46/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Title | German: | ROHRFÖRMIGER PORÖSER FASERFILTER MIT KLEINEM DURCHMESSER | [2020/29] | English: | SMALL DIAMETER TUBULAR POROUS FIBER FILTER | [2020/29] | French: | FILTRE À FIBRES POREUSES TUBULAIRES DE PETIT DIAMÈTRE | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 29.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4116738 (PALL DAVID B) [Y] 1-15 * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 37 * * column 7, lines 30-49 * * column 11, lines 9-23,49-50 *; | [A]US4917942 (WINTERS JOHN C [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, lines 6-8; figure 1; claim 16 * * column 3, lines 40-49 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 32 *; | [A]EP0695573 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 1-15* column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 32; figures 1,2; claims 1,3,8,9 *; | [Y]US5607766 (BERGER RICHARD M [US]) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, lines 8-15 * * column 8, lines 17-22 * * column 9, lines 12-38 *; | [A]CN101098741 (DONALDSON CO INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]CA1119104 (ALLEN EDDY) [Y] 3/1-2* ; abstract; page 8, lines 4-9 *; | [XY]US5607766 (BERGER RICHARD M [US]) [X] 1-2 * ; abstract; figures 4, 10; column 6, lines 61-67; column 9, lines 12-21 * [Y] 3/1-2 | by applicant | US4116738 | US5607766 |