EP3681489 - METHODS FOR TREATING DEPRESSION AND MAJOR DEPRESIVE DISORDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carmel Haifa University Economic Corporation Ltd. Eshkol Tower, Haifa University Mount Carmel 31905 Haifa / IL | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROZENBLUM, Yaacov 12 Te'ashur Street 3095223 Zikhron Ya'akov / IL | 02 /
TAHA, Elham 2496300 Kabul / IL | 03 /
ADAIKKAN, Chinnakkaruppan 9 Kidder Avenue Somerville Massachusetts 02144 / US | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18853562.9 | 06.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018IL51010 | Priority number, date | US201762556440P | 10.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762556440 P | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019049148 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3681489 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, A61K38/17, A61P25/24, G01N33/68 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
A61P25/24 (EP,US);
A61K38/005 (US);
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K38/162 (US);
A61K38/17 (EP);
G01N33/6896 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | A61K31/135, A61P25/24, A61K38/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DEPRESSION UND SCHWERER DEPRESSION | [2020/30] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATING DEPRESSION AND MAJOR DEPRESIVE DISORDER | [2020/30] | French: | MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA DÉPRESSION ET DU TROUBLE DÉPRESSIF MAJEUR | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 22.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009042906 (UNIV COLORADO [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* example 2 *; | [X]US2010304391 (LOMBARD JAY L [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0026] - [0027] - [0179] *; | [XY]WO2015018375 (SHANGHAI INST BIOL SCIENCES [CN]) [X] 1-7,11-14 * abstract * [Y] 8-10,15; | [XY]US2017247374 (LEVY DANIEL EMIL [US], et al) [X] 1-7,11-14 * paragraphs [0005] , [0168]; claim 16 * [Y] 8-10,15; | [X] - LI KUN ET AL, "[beta]CaMKII in Lateral Habenula Mediates Core Symptoms of Depression", SCIENCE, US, vol. 341, no. 6149, doi:10.1126/science.1240729, ISSN 0036-8075, (20130829), pages 1016 - 1020, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC3932364/pdf/nihms532664.pdf, (20210412), XP055794245 [X] 1-6,11-14 * pages 3-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1240729 | [Y] - AHMED MOHAMMAD EJAZ ET AL, "Beneficial Effects of a CaMKII[alpha] Inhibitor TatCN21 Peptide in Global Cerebral Ischemia", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR NEUROSCIENCE, BIRKHAEUSER, CAMBRIDGE, MA, US, vol. 61, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S12031-016-0830-8, ISSN 0895-8696, (20160907), pages 42 - 51, (20160907), XP036128997 [Y] 1-15 * pages 45-46 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12031-016-0830-8 | International search | [XY] - Steven j. Coultrap, Et Al, "Autonomous CaMKII Mediates Both LTP and LTD Using a Mechanism for Differential Substrate Site Selection", Cell Reports, US, (20140201), vol. 6, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.celrep.2014.01.005, ISSN 2211-1247, pages 431 - 437, XP055677830 [X] 1 [Y] 2-19, 21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.celrep.2014.01.005 | [XY] - A J Robison et al, "Fluoxetine Epigenetically Alters the CaMKIIα Promoter in Nucleus Accumbens to Regulate ΔFosB Binding and Antidepressant Effects", NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, US, (20140401), vol. 39, no. 5, doi:10.1038/npp.2013.319, ISSN 0893-133X, pages 1178 - 1186, XP055677840 [X] 1 [Y] 2-19, 21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/npp.2013.319 | [Y] - Ying Xu, Et Al, "Effects of Low-Dose and Very Low-Dose Ketamine among Patients with Major Depression: a Systematic Review and Meta-Analysis", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, Cambridge, (20160401), vol. 19, no. 4, doi:10.1093/ijnp/pyv124, ISSN 1461-1457, pages 1 - 15, XP055677845 [Y] 2-14, 21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ijnp/pyv124 | [Y] - Rasmussen Keith G et al, "Serial infusions of low-dose ketamine for major depression", JOURNAL OF PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, GB, (20130501), vol. 27, no. 5, doi:10.1177/0269881113478283, ISSN 0269-8811, pages 444 - 450, XP009171072 [Y] 2-14, 21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/0269881113478283 | [Y] - Rong-Jian Liu, Et Al, "GSK-3 Inhibition Potentiates the Synaptogenic and Antidepressant-Like Effects of Subthreshold Doses of Ketamine", NEUROPSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, US, (20131001), vol. 38, no. 11, doi:10.1038/npp.2013.128, ISSN 0893-133X, pages 2268 - 2277, XP055677848 [Y] 2-19, 21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/npp.2013.128 | [Y] - Chun Yang, Et Al, "Acute administration of ketamine in rats increases hippocampal BDNF and mTOR levels during forced swimming test", UPSALA JOURNAL OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, SE, (20130301), vol. 118, no. 1, doi:10.3109/03009734.2012.724118, ISSN 0300-9734, pages 3 - 8, XP055677851 [Y] 15-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/03009734.2012.724118 |