EP3680338 - GENETICALLY ENGINEERED T CELL AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRAGE medical Co., Limited RM12, 20/F, Ho King Comm CTR 2-16 FaYuen ST Mongkok Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [2022/17] |
Former [2021/40] | For all designated states CAFA THERAPEUTICS LIMITED 2/3 Exchange Place, IFSC Dublin D01 AE27 / IE | ||
Former [2020/29] | For all designated states Carsgen Therapeutics Co., Ltd. Building 12 No.388 Yindu Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200231 / CN | ||
For all designated states Shanghai Cancer Institute No. 25/Ln 2200 Xietu Road. Xuhui District Shanghai 200032 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zonghai Building 12 No. 388 Yindu Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200231 / CN | 02 /
GUO, Xingliang Building B No. 388 Yindu Road Xuhui District Shanghai 200231 / CN | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/29] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18854823.4 | 07.09.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018CN104669 | Priority number, date | CN201710805991 | 08.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710805991 | CN201710867308 | 22.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710867308 | CN201711287300 | 07.12.2017 Original published format: CN201711287300 | [2020/29] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019047932 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3680338 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/87, A61K48/00, A61P35/00, C07K14/47, A61K39/00, C12N5/0783, C12N9/22, C12N15/10, C12N15/11, C12N15/86, C12N15/90 | [2021/22] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,CN,US);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,CN);
A61K39/4631 (EP,CN);
A61K39/4635 (EP,CN);
A61K39/464474 (EP,CN);
A61P31/00 (EP,CN);
A61P37/04 (EP,CN);
C07K14/47 (EP);
C07K14/70521 (US);
C07K14/70575 (US);
C07K16/2818 (US);
C12N15/86 (US);
C12N15/907 (EP);
C12N5/0636 (EP,CN);
C12N5/10 (EP);
C12N9/22 (US);
A61K2239/53 (EP,CN);
A61K48/005 (EP);
C07K2319/02 (CN);
C07K2319/03 (EP,CN);
C12N15/102 (EP);
C12N15/1138 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/29] | C12N15/87, A61K48/00, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Title | German: | GENETISCH VERÄNDERTE T-ZELLE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2020/29] | English: | GENETICALLY ENGINEERED T CELL AND APPLICATION THEREOF | [2020/29] | French: | LYMPHOCYTE T GÉNÉTIQUEMENT MODIFIÉ ET SON APPLICATION | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2020 | Translation filed | 08.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 30.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013074916 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] 1-15 * claim 3 *; | [A]WO2015136001 (CELLECTIS [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 6, line 1 - line 11 *; | [A]WO2017106537 (SANGAMO BIOSCIENCES INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * claim 4 *; | [XI] - Biliang Hu ET AL, "CAR T Cells Secreting IL18 Augment Antitumor Immunity and 2 Increase T Cell Proliferation and Costimulation", bioRxiv, doi:10.1101/111260, (20170227), pages 1 - 28, URL: https://www.biorxiv.org/content/10.1101/111260v2.full.pdf, (20201111), XP055749456 [X] 1-14 * abstract; p 4, l 98 ff.; p 9, l 309 to p 10, l 343; p 12, l 414 to p 13, l 452; figure 6 * [I] 15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/111260 | [A] - M. CHMIELEWSKI ET AL, "IL-12 Release by Engineered T Cells Expressing Chimeric Antigen Receptors Can Effectively Muster an Antigen-Independent Macrophage Response on Tumor Cells That Have Shut Down Tumor Antigen Expression", CANCER RESEARCH, (20110708), vol. 71, no. 17, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-0103, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 5697 - 5706, XP055185302 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-0103 | [A] - MYTHILI KONERUA ET AL, "IL-12 secreting tumor-targeted chimeric antigen receptor T cells eradicate ovarian tumors in vivo", ONCOLMMUNOLOGY, vol. 4, no. 3, doi:10.4161/2162402X.2014.994446, ISSN 2162-402X, (20150301), pages 1 - 11, (20150123), XP009184024 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/2162402X.2014.994446 | [A] - H. J. PEGRAM ET AL, "Tumor-targeted T cells modified to secrete IL-12 eradicate systemic tumors without need for prior conditioning", BLOOD, (20120221), vol. 119, no. 18, doi:10.1182/blood-2011-12-400044, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 4133 - 4141, XP055109416 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2011-12-400044 | [A] - LI HUA ET AL, "Increasing the safety and efficacy of chimeric antigen receptor T cell therapy", PROTEIN & CELL, SPRINGER ASIA, BEIJING, CN, vol. 8, no. 8, doi:10.1007/S13238-017-0411-9, ISSN 1674-800X, (20170422), pages 573 - 589, (20170422), XP036293648 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13238-017-0411-9 | [XPI] - BILIANG HU ET AL, "Augmentation of Antitumor Immunity by Human and Mouse CAR T Cells Secreting IL-18", CELL REPORTS, US, (20170926), vol. 20, no. 13, doi:10.1016/j.celrep.2017.09.002, ISSN 2211-1247, pages 3025 - 3033, XP055620407 [XP] 1-14 * the whole document * [I] 15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.celrep.2017.09.002 |