EP3678516 - POCKET-COIL MATTRESS CONSTRUCTION FOR EASE OF TRANSPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mantzis Holdings Pty Ltd. 27-29 Jesica Road Campbellfield, Victoria 3061 / AU | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANTZIS, Vasilios George 27-29 Jesica Road Campbellfield, Victoria 3061 / AU | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 18854963.8 | 05.09.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018AU50957 | Priority number, date | AU20170903580 | 05.09.2017 Original published format: AU 2017903580 | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019046892 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3678516 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47C27/06, A47C27/07, B65B1/26, B65B63/02, B65B5/04, B65B11/00, B65B63/04 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
A47C27/064 (EP,AU,US);
B65B63/028 (AU,US);
A47C27/001 (AU,US);
A47C27/07 (EP,US);
B65B1/26 (EP,US);
B65B11/00 (EP);
B65B5/045 (EP,US);
B65B63/02 (EP);
B65B63/04 (EP,AU);
|
Former IPC [2020/29] | A47C27/06, A47C27/07, B65B63/02, B65B31/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Title | German: | KONSTRUKTION EINER TASCHENFEDERKERNMATRATZE FÜR EINFACHEN TRANSPORT | [2020/29] | English: | POCKET-COIL MATTRESS CONSTRUCTION FOR EASE OF TRANSPORT | [2020/29] | French: | CONSTRUCTION DE MATELAS À RESSORTS ENSACHÉS POUR FACILITER LE TRANSPORT | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 03.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.02.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007204566 (LEE YOUN JAE [US]); | [XI]FR3001373 (LATFOAM [FR]); | [IY]CN105852516 (ZHEJIANG MENGSHEN HOUSEHOLD CO LTD) | International search | [A]US4711067 (MAGNI GIULIANO [IT]) [A] 1-13 * Whole Document *; | [XY]US5214809 (STUART PAUL [US]) [X] 1-4 * ABSTRACT, CollLn64 & Fig 1-4 Itm7,13&16 ABSTRACT, CollLn64 & Fig 1-4 Itm7,13&16 * [Y] 5-13; | [A]US5953778 (HIATT SIDNEY A [US]) [A] 1-13 * Whole Document *; | [A]US6901722 (DEXTRAZE PAUL N [US], et al) [A] 1-13* Whole Document *; | [A]GB2434092 (HARRISON A [GB]) [A] 1-13 * Whole Document *; | [Y]US2007204566 (LEE YOUN JAE [US]) [Y] 5-13 * ABSTRACT & Figl&4-5 Itml6 *; | [A]CN203314530U (DONGGUAN YILIANNA FURNITURE CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * Whole Document *; | [Y]WO2014071627 (COSPA CREATION INC [JP], et al) [Y] 6, 8 & 11-13 * ABSTRACT, Pg6-7 & Figl-2 Itml *; | [XY]FR3001373 (LATFOAM [FR]) [X] 1-4 * ABSTRACT & Fig 1-3, Itm3,15,X&25 ABSTRACT& Figl-2, Itm3,15,X&25 * [Y] 5-13; | [Y]CN105852516 (ZHEJIANG MENGSHEN HOUSEHOLD CO LTD) [Y] 6, 8 & 11-13 * ABSTRACT FiglItmX & Par4&9-10 * | by applicant | US2007204566 | FR3001373 | CN105852516 |