EP3680940 - SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER MANUFACTURING METHOD, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY BEAM DETECTING ELEMENT, AND SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSUGI, Kazumasa c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
KAMADA, Shintaro c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 03 /
YAMAMURA, Kazuhisa c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 18854988.5 | 05.09.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018JP32912 | Priority number, date | JP20170173049 | 08.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017173049 | [2020/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019049900 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3680940 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/103, H01L31/18, H01L31/118 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
H01L31/103 (EP);
H01L31/02363 (US);
G01T1/242 (EP);
H01L27/1446 (EP);
H01L31/115 (US);
H01L31/1185 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/29] | H01L31/10, H01L31/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERWAFERHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HALBLEITERENERGIESTRAHLERDETEKTIONSELEMENTS UND HALBLEITERWAFER | [2020/29] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER MANUFACTURING METHOD, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY BEAM DETECTING ELEMENT, AND SEMICONDUCTOR WAFER | [2020/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE TRANCHE SEMI-CONDUCTRICE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENT DE DÉTECTION DE FAISCEAU D'ÉNERGIE DE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, ET TRANCHE SEMI-CONDUCTRICE | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2020 | Translation filed | 09.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 27.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6333457 (MULLIGAN WILLIAM P [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 67 ** figure 1 *; | [X]WO2016114377 (SHIZUKUISHI MAKOTO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0037] - [0044] * * figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]JP2005533587 [A] 1-6 * , I *; | [A]JP2010239005 (UNIV KINKI, et al) [A] 1-6 * , *; | [A]US2012235262 (JONES CHRISTOPHER [GB], et al) [A] 1-6* , & WO 2011/067058 A1 *; | [A]JP2014220403 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [A] 1-6 * , & WO 2014/181665 A1 *; | [A]JP2015050223 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [A] 1-6 * , & WO 2015/029705 A1 *; | [A]JP2017034288 (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [A] 1-6 * , * | by applicant | JP2015019540 |