EP3735321 - CENTRIFUGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krettek, Guntram Mozartstrasse 4 41749 Viersen / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2020/46] | For all designated states Krettek, Guntram Mozartstrasse 4 41749 Viersen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/46] | Representative(s) | Willems, Volker Patentanwälte Weisse, Moltmann & Willems PartGmbB Am Lomberg 13 42555 Velbert / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2020/46] | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Mörikestrasse 18 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 18855113.9 | 19.12.2018 | [2020/46] | WO2018DE00381 | Priority number, date | DE20181000057 | 05.01.2018 Original published format: DE102018000057 | [2020/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019134722 | Date: | 11.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3735321 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3735321 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B04B1/00 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
B04B1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGE | [2020/46] | English: | CENTRIFUGE | [2020/46] | French: | CENTRIFUGEUSE | [2020/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/46] | 27.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 12.07.2023 | DK | 12.07.2023 | EE | 12.07.2023 | FI | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | LT | 12.07.2023 | LV | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | NL | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SE | 12.07.2023 | SI | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | PT | 13.11.2023 | LU | 19.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SI | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
EE | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
DK | 12.07.2023 | ||
FI | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
LV | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
PT | 13.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 12.07.2023 | |
LT | 12.07.2023 | ||
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
SE | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 12.07.2023 | |
NL | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 12.07.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US1710447 (BRYSON TANDY A) [X] 1,2,6,10 * page 2, line 68 - line 102; figure - *; | [X]US1828096 (BRYSON TANDY A) [X] 1,2,8,10 * page 3, line 127 - page 4, line 13 * * page 5, line 87 - line 96; figure - *; | [XY]US5743840 (CARR ROBERT B [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * column 2, line 1 - line 19; figure - * [Y] 9-13; | [XI]DE19801733 (ADP ANLAGEN PLANUNG ANDREAS DO [DE]) [X] 1,9,10 * column 4, line 44 - line 62; figures 1,4; claims 6,10 * [I] 6,11; | [YD]EP1434655 (KRETTEK GUNTRAM [DE]) [YD] 9-13* figure -; claim - * | by applicant | EP1434655 | DE19925082 |