EP3682022 - HUMAN THERAPEUTIC TARGETS AND MODULATORS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LifeMine Therapeutics, Inc. 30 Acorn Park Drive Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | [2024/35] |
Former [2020/30] | For all designated states Lifemine Therapeutics, Inc. 30 Acorn Park Drive Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIGGINS, John Baxter c/o LIFEMINE THERAPEUTICS, INC. 30 Acorn Park Drive Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US | 02 /
BOWMAN, Brian Roger c/o LIFEMINE THERAPEUTICS, INC. 30 Acorn Park Drive Cambridge Massachusetts 02140 / US | 03 /
VERDINE, Gregory L. c/o LIFEMINE THERAPEUTICS, INC. 30 Acorn Park Drive Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18855399.4 | 14.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018US51134 | Priority number, date | US201762558744P | 14.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762558744 P | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019055816 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3682022 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G16B10/00, G16B30/10, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6895, C12N9/02, C12N9/58, C12N15/52 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
G16B10/00 (EP);
G16B20/00 (US);
G16B30/10 (EP);
G16B35/10 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/6895, C12N9/02, C12N9/58, C12N15/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | MENSCHLICHE THERAPEUTISCHE ZIELMOLEKÜLE UND MODULATOREN DAVON | [2020/30] | English: | HUMAN THERAPEUTIC TARGETS AND MODULATORS THEREOF | [2020/30] | French: | CIBLES THÉRAPEUTIQUES HUMAINES ET MODULATEURS ASSOCIÉS | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 13.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 23.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004076981 (YODER OLEN [US], et al); | [A]US2006205017 (HANDELSMAN JO [US], et al); | [A]US8065089 (NAJARIAN KAYVAN [US]); | [A]WO2014071182 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]); | [X]WO2017100917 (UNIV MCMASTER [CA]); | [PX]WO2018094110 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]); |