EP3683723 - VIDEO CLASSIFICATION METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2020/30] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Yongyi 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
MA, Lin 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Wei 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18855424.0 | 16.08.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018CN100733 | Priority number, date | CN201710833668 | 15.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710833668 | [2020/30] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019052301 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683723 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06K9/00, G06K9/62 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
G06V20/41 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F16/735 (CN);
G06F16/75 (CN);
G06F16/783 (CN);
G06F16/9535 (CN);
G06F17/15 (US);
G06F18/00 (KR);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06F18/2413 (EP);
G06N3/044 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06N3/048 (CN);
G06N3/08 (CN,KR);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | G06K9/62, G06N3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Extension states | BA | 03.03.2020 | ME | 03.03.2020 | Validation states | KH | 03.03.2020 | MA | 03.03.2020 | MD | 03.03.2020 | TN | 03.03.2020 | Title | German: | VIDEOKLASSIFIKATIONSVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND SERVER | [2020/30] | English: | VIDEO CLASSIFICATION METHOD, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND SERVER | [2020/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CLASSIFICATION DE VIDÉOS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SERVEUR | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2019 | Translation filed | 03.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 20.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - SHAOXIANG CHEN ET AL, "Aggregating Frame-level Features for Large-Scale Video Classification", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20170704), XP080774127 [X] 1-3,5,6,10,12,13,15,16 * abstract; Secitions 1, 3, and 4;; figure 1 * [I] 4,7-9,11,14 | [I] - HE-DA WANG ET AL, "The Monkeytyping Solution to the YouTube-8M Video Understanding Challenge", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20170616), XP080770282 [I] 1-16 * abstract; Sections 1-9;; figures 1, 3 * | [I] - Bogun Ivan ET AL, "Object Recognition from Short Videos for Robotic Perception", (20150904), pages 1 - 9, URL: https://arxiv.org/pdf/1509.01602.pdf, (20210504), XP055801180 [I] 1-16 * abstract; Section I, III, and IV;; figure 1 * | [A] - LIMIN WANG ET AL, "Temporal Segment Networks for Action Recognition in Videos", ARXIV.ORG, CORNELL UNIVERSITY LIBRARY, 201 OLIN LIBRARY CORNELL UNIVERSITY ITHACA, NY 14853, (20170508), XP080946741 [A] 1-16 * abstract; Sections 1 and 3-5;; figure 1 * | [A] - XU ZHENQI ET AL, "Recurrent convolutional neural network for video classification", 2016 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO (ICME), IEEE, (20160711), doi:10.1109/ICME.2016.7552971, pages 1 - 6, XP032953252 [A] 1-16 * abstract; Sections 1-3;; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2016.7552971 |