EP3683459 - SHAFT STOPPER RING AND IMAGE FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIURA, Hiroshi c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGUCHI, Yoshimasu c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18855702.9 | 14.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018JP34943 | Priority number, date | JP20170178078 | 15.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017178078 | [2020/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019054521 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683459 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16B21/18, F16C19/04, F16C35/073, G03G21/16 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
F16B21/186 (EP);
F16C35/063 (US);
B65H5/06 (US);
F16C19/04 (EP);
F16C35/073 (EP);
G03G15/6529 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | WELLENANSCHLAGRING UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/30] | English: | SHAFT STOPPER RING AND IMAGE FORMING DEVICE | [2020/30] | French: | BAGUE DE BUTÉE D'ARBRE ET DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGE | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2020 | Translation filed | 15.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 19.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]GB752758 (WALDES KOHINOOR INC) [X] 1-4,11,12,14 * page 2, line 58 - page 4, line 6; figures 1-10 * [Y] 15-17 [I] 5-10,13; | [XYI]DE1400767 (HUGO BENZINGER OHG) [X] 1,3-6,11,12,14 * page 7, paragraph 1 - page 10, paragraph l; figures 1-8 * [Y] 15-17 [I] 13; | [Y]US2008199116 (TAMURA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 15,16 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0055]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]JP2016173112 (RICOH CO LTD) [Y] 15,17* paragraphs [0013] , [0014]; figure 2 * | International search | [XYA]JPS5289539U (OKUNO, Toshikazu) [X] 1, 13-14 * , specification, page 2, line 7 to page 3, line 4, fig. 1-6 (Family: none) * [Y] 15-17 [A] 2-12; | [XYA]JP2006153172 (JTEKT CORP) [X] 1-2, 4-5, 7-8, 14 * , paragraphs [0014]-[0024], fig. 1-4 (Family: none) * [Y] 15-17 [A] 3, 6, 9-13; | [Y]JP2008201510 (KONICA MINOLTA BUSINESS TECH) [Y] 15-16 * , paragraphs [0016]-[0018], fig. 1 & US 2008/0199116 A1 paragraphs [0031]-[0033], fig. 1 *; | [Y]JP2016173112 (RICOH CO LTD) [Y] 15, 17* , paragraphs [0013]-[0014], fig. 2 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH0519640 |