EP3681414 - ENDOSCOPIC SURGICAL CLIP APPLIER AND HANDLE ASSEMBLIES FOR USE THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARIL, Jacob C. 23 Noahs Lane Extension Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | 02 /
CRESTON, Brian J. 7 Renees Way Madison, Connecticut 06443 / US | 03 /
SNIFFIN, Kevin S. 8 South Street Roxbury, Connecticut 06783 / US | 04 /
ZAMMATARO, Thomas A. 110 Filbert Street Hamden, Connecticut 06517 / US | 05 /
DININO, Matthew A. 50 Windmill Lane Newington, Connecticut 06111 / US | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Maschio & Soames IP Ltd 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18855736.7 | 11.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018US50316 | Priority number, date | US201762557347P | 12.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762557347 P | US201816041916 | 23.07.2018 Original published format: US201816041916 | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019055359 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3681414 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/128, A61B17/122, A61B17/10, A61B17/00, A61B34/00 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B90/08 (US);
A61B17/2909 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00115 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00407 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00464 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2929 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0807 (US);
A61B2090/0811 (EP,US);
A61B34/37 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | APPLIKATOR FÜR ENDOSKOPISCHE CHIRURGISCHE KLAMMERN UND GRIFFANORDNUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAMIT | [2020/30] | English: | ENDOSCOPIC SURGICAL CLIP APPLIER AND HANDLE ASSEMBLIES FOR USE THEREWITH | [2020/30] | French: | APPLICATEUR D'AGRAFES CHIRURGICALES ENDOSCOPIQUE ET ENSEMBLES DE POIGNÉES DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS AVEC CELUI-CI | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 13.10.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2008127968 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * See the whole document. *; | [Y]US2013325057 (LARSON ERIC R [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * See paragraphs [18]-[51], claims 1,13 and figures 1A-8. *; | [A]US2015201953 (STROBL GEOFFREY S [US], et al) [A] 1-18* See the whole document. *; | [Y]WO2017075752 (COVIDIEN LP [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * See paragraphs [60],[86], claim 6 and figures 9-12D. *; | [A]US2017128071 (HOLSTEN HENRY E [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * See the whole document. * |