EP3579307 - ELECTRODE FOR ALL-SOLID-STATE BATTERY INCLUDING SOLID ELECTROLYTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/50] | ELECTRODE FOR ALL-SOLID-STATE BATTERY, COMPRISING SOLID ELECTROLYTE | ||
[2023/37] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LT, NO | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution Ltd. Tower 1, 108 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu 07335 Seoul / KR | ||
Former [2019/50] | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jung-Pil LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Ji-Young LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Hyo-Sik LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
MOK, Eun-Kyung LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
WOO, Seung-He LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
JUNG, Hye-Ri LG Chem Research Park 188 Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2019/50] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/08] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2019/50] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18855823.3 | 11.09.2018 | [2019/50] | WO2018KR10643 | Priority number, date | KR20170117375 | 13.09.2017 Original published format: KR 20170117375 | [2019/50] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019054729 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3579307 | Date: | 11.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3579307 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/13, H01M4/62, H01M10/0562, H01M10/0565 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
H01M4/366 (EP,US);
H01M4/13 (EP,KR);
H01M4/131 (CN);
H01M10/52 (US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,CN);
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0565 (EP,KR);
H01M4/133 (CN);
H01M4/134 (CN);
H01M4/136 (CN);
H01M4/62 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/624 (KR);
H01M4/625 (EP);
H01M2300/0068 (EP,KR);
H01M2300/0071 (EP);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,KR);
H01M2300/0085 (EP,KR);
H01M2300/0091 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODE MIT FESTELEKTROLYT UMFASSEND FESTELEKTROLYTBATTERIE | [2023/37] | English: | ELECTRODE FOR ALL-SOLID-STATE BATTERY INCLUDING SOLID ELECTROLYTE | [2023/37] | French: | ÉLECTRODE POUR BATTERIE TOUT SOLIDE, COMPRENANT UN ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE | [2019/50] |
Former [2019/50] | ELEKTRODE MIT FESTELEKTROLYT FÜR FESTELEKTROLYTBATTERIE | ||
Former [2019/50] | ELECTRODE FOR ALL-SOLID-STATE BATTERY, COMPRISING SOLID ELECTROLYTE | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2019 | Translation filed | 05.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/50] | 15.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2010262764 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [X]US2012251871 (SUZUKI GEN [JP], et al); | [X]EP3104436 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [X]WO2017111132 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) | International search | [XY]KR19980080161 ; | [A]JP2005085675 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP4577024B ; | [Y]KR20140087376 (UNIST ACADEMY IND RES CORP [KR], et al); | [A]KR20140094676 (SAMSUNG FINE CHEMICALS CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | KR20170117375 |