EP3681886 - WNT PATHWAY MODULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/30] | WNT PATHWAY MODULATORS | ||
[2023/10] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agency for Science, Technology and Research 1 Fusionopolis Way 20-10 Connexis Singapore 138632 / SG | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANCHARD, Stephanie Eliane 31 Biopolis Way 01-02a Nanos Singapore 138632 / SG | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18856092.4 | 11.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018SG50460 | Priority number, date | SG20171007564X | 14.09.2017 Original published format: SG10201707564X | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019054941 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3681886 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SG | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/08, A61P3/00, A61P35/00, A61K31/522 | [2021/18] | CPC: |
C07D473/08 (EP);
C07D487/04 (US);
A61K31/522 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | C07D473/08, A61K31/522, A61P35/00, A61P3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | MODULATOR DES WNT-SIGNALWEGS | [2023/10] | English: | WNT PATHWAY MODULATOR | [2023/10] | French: | MODULATEUR DE LA VOIE WNT | [2023/10] |
Former [2020/30] | MODULATOREN DES WNT-SIGNALWEGS | ||
Former [2020/30] | WNT PATHWAY MODULATORS | ||
Former [2020/30] | MODULATEURS DE LA VOIE WNT | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 29.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/50] | 25.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO2014189466 (AGENCY SCIENCE TECH & RES [SG]) [A] 1-17 * [0005], pg 30, right column, last compound, pg 31, right column, third compound *; | [A] - HO, S. Y. et al., "Scaffold Hopping and Optimization of Maleimide Based Porcupine Inhibitors", Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, vol. 60, no. 15, doi:doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.7b00662, (20170703), pages 6678 - 6692, (20181010), XP055403341 [A] 1-17 * pg 6678, left column, first paragraph and Figure 1, ETC-159 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.7b00662 | [A] - MADAN, B. et al., "Wnt addiction of genetically defined cancers reversed by PORCN inhibition", Oncogene, vol. 35, no. 17, doi:doi:10.1038/onc.2015.280, (20150810), pages 2197 - 2207, (20181010), XP055496939 [A] 1-17 * introduction, Figure 1 a, ETC-159 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/onc.2015.280 | by applicant | US2004162263 | WO2014189466 | - HO, S. Y. et al., Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, (20170000), vol. 60, no. 15, pages 6678 - 6692 | - MADAN, B. et al., Oncogene, (20150000), vol. 35, no. 17, pages 2197 - 2207 | - S. M. BERGE et al., J. Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Science, Mack Publishing Company, (19760000), vol. XIV, page 33 |