EP3683876 - POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, METHOD FOR PRODUCING POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, POSITIVE ELECTRODE, AND SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanoh Industrial Co., Ltd. 1-23-23 Ebisu Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0013 / JP | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAI Yoshiyuki c/o Sanoh Industrial Co. Ltd. 758 Konosu koga-shi Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | 02 /
SUGITA Kazuyuki c/o Sanoh Industrial Co. Ltd. 758 Konosu koga-shi Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | 03 /
HONDA Atsushi c/o Sanoh Industrial Co. Ltd. 758 Konosu koga-shi Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | 04 /
TAKIMOTO Yuichiro c/o Sanoh Industrial Co. Ltd. 758 Konosu koga-shi Ibaraki 306-0041 / JP | 05 /
KURIHARA Hideki c/o Saitama Industrial Technology Center 3-12-18 Kamiaoki Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 333-0844 / JP | 06 /
INAMOTO Masashi c/o Saitama Industrial Technology Center 3-12-18 Kamiaoki Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 333-0844 / JP | 07 /
DOUMAE Kyousuke c/o TANAKA CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-10 Aza-Sunahamawari 45 Shirakata-cho Fukui-shi Fukui 910-3131 / JP | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18856269.8 | 12.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018JP33741 | Priority number, date | JP20170177820 | 15.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017177820 | [2020/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019054395 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3683876 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/48, C01G31/02, H01M10/052, H01M10/054, H01M4/36, H01M10/0525, H01M4/131, // H01M4/02 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
H01M4/48 (EP);
H01M4/364 (US);
C01G31/00 (EP);
C01G31/02 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/054 (EP,US);
H01M4/0471 (US);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/133 (US);
H01M4/1391 (US);
H01M4/1393 (US);
H01M4/525 (US);
C01P2002/72 (EP);
C01P2004/03 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | H01M4/48, C01G31/02, H01M10/052, H01M10/054 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | POSITIVELEKTRODEN-AKTIVMATERIAL, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES POSITIVELEKTRODEN-AKTIVMATERIALS, POSITIVELEKTRODE UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE | [2020/30] | English: | POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, METHOD FOR PRODUCING POSITIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL, POSITIVE ELECTRODE, AND SECONDARY BATTERY | [2020/30] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE ET BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2020 | Translation filed | 12.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]RU2100464 (N PROIZV OB EDINENIE VANADIJ K [KZ]) [X] 5,7 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] * [A] 1-4,6,8,9,11-14[I] 10; | [XAI]US2011095242 (JIN PING [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,12 * paragraphs [0109] , [ 114] - [0116] * [A] 3,4,7-9,11,13,14 [I] 10; | [XA]US2015228969 (CHO JAEPHIL [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,4,11,13,14 * figure 2(b); example 1; claim 19 * * paragraph [0108] * [A] 2,5-10,12 | International search | [Y]JP2011054389 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [Y] 10 * , *; | [XYA]JP2012116737 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN) [X] 1, 3-5, 8-9, 11, 13-14 * , * [Y] 10 [A] 2, 6-7, 12; | [XYA]JP2015071531 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD, et al) [X] 1, 3-5, 7-9, 11, 13-14 * , * [Y] 10 [A] 2, 6, 12; | [PA]CN107500355 (BEIJING INSTITUTE TECH)[PA] 1-14; | [A] - TOKYO KAGAKU DOJIN KK, "Vanadium oxide", ENCYCLOPEDIC DICTIONARY OF CHEMISTRY, (19891020), ISBN 4-8079-0323-3, pages 881 - 882, XP009519676 [A] 1-14 | by applicant | JP2003282371 | JP2011054389 | JP2013058348 | JP2017177820 | - M. HIBINOY. IKEDAY. NOGUCHIT. KUDO, Production Research, (20000000), vol. 52, page 516 | - J.C TROMBE, J. Solid State Chem., (20070000), vol. 180, pages 2102 - 2109 | - N. WANG, J. Soild State Chem., (20080000), vol. 181, pages 652 - 657 |