EP3682339 - DEVICE, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR A POST BENCHMARK AND PROJECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viacom International Inc. 1515 Broadway New York, NY 10036 / US | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERZIN, David 1515 Broadway New York, NY 10036 / US | 02 /
MARELLA, Sashi 1515 Broadway New York, NY 10036 / US | 03 /
MANOHAR, Tanmay 1515 Broadway New York, NY 10036 / US | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/30] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18856444.7 | 19.07.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018US42910 | Priority number, date | US201715703622 | 13.09.2017 Original published format: US201715703622 | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019055123 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3682339 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F16/00, G06Q30/02, G06Q50/00, H04L29/08 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0244 (EP,US);
G06F16/9535 (US);
G06F16/955 (US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0271 (EP,US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN POST-BENCHMARK UND PROJEKTION | [2020/30] | English: | DEVICE, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR A POST BENCHMARK AND PROJECTION | [2020/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À UNE RÉFÉRENCE DE MESSAGE ET À UNE PROJECTION | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 30.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US9396483 (HAMEDI JEHAN [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - column 3, line 62 * * column 4, line 35 - column 35, line 65 ** figures 1-8 * | International search | [XY]US2016071162 (OGAWA STUART [US], et al) [X] 1-11, 16-20 * entire document * [Y] 12-15; | [Y]US2015193889 (GARG MOHIT [IN], et al) [Y] 12-15 * entire document *; | [A]US2015317688 (BHAMIDIPATI VENKATA S J R [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2014222819 (DIES ERIK [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US9667732 (SMITH SCOTT H [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document * |