EP3681349 - FURNITURE SECURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elbee Pty Ltd. P.O. Box 2022 Bondi Junction 1355 / AU | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARSDEN, Andrew 54 Governor Long Rd. Hingham, MA 02043 / US | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Tobiasz-Dumania, Katarzyna, et al Baker & McKenzie Krzyzowski i Wspolnicy sp. k. Rondo ONZ 1 00-124 Warszawa / PL | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18857075.8 | 12.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018IB01142 | Priority number, date | US201762558853P | 14.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762558853 P | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019053510 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3681349 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3681349 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47B97/00, B60P7/08, B60P7/13, B60P7/135, B61D45/00, B64D9/00, // F16M13/02 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
A47B97/001 (EP);
A47B97/00 (AU,US);
A47B95/008 (EP);
F16M13/022 (EP,US);
A47B2097/008 (EP,AU,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | A47B97/00, B60P7/08, B60P7/13, B60P7/135, B61D45/00, B64D9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MÖBELBEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/30] | English: | FURNITURE SECURING DEVICE | [2020/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION DE MEUBLES | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 03.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS55122654U (ND) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US4850769 (MATTHEWS JAMES R [US]) [Y] 1-16 * figures 2-3 *; | [A]KR19980018401U (ND) [A] 1-16* figures 1-2 *; | [Y]CN206166322U (GUANGZHOU PRODIGY DAILY-PRODUCTION CO LTD) [Y] 1-16 * figures 1-4 * | International search | [Y]US3409264 (SCHWIEBERT PHILLIP D, et al) [Y] 1-18 & 27-29 * Figures 1-6: Items 20, 23, 40, 42, 48 & 55 *; | [A]JPS57111247U (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LID.) [A] 1-36 * Whole of Document *; | [Y]US4850769 (MATTHEWS JAMES R [US]) [Y] 1-18 * Figures 2-3: Items 24-30 & 32 *; | [A]US2006097123 (GALLIEN JAMES M [US]) [A] 1-36* Whole of Document *; | [A]GB2471315 (DONOHOE MARK JOHN [GB]) [A] 1-36 * Whole of Document *; | [XY]CN206166322U (GUANGZHOU PRODIGY DAILY-PRODUCTION CO LTD) [X] 19-26 & 30-36 * Figures 1-3: Items 11-33 and Paragraphs 14, 24-27 & 29-31 Figures 1-3: Items 11-33 and Paragraphs 14, 24-27 & 29-31 * [Y] 1-18 & 27-29; | [A]US2017164738 (CLEMENTS CALYN [US]) [A] 1-36 * Whole of Document * | by applicant | CN206166322U |