EP3685589 - PRINTABLE DIFFUSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitek Corp., Inc. 4545 East Baseline Road Phoenix, Arizona 85042 / US | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IVEY, Johnathan 4295 W. Lindbergh Way Chandler, AZ 85226 / US | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Script Intellectual Property LLP Suite J, Anchor House School Close Chandlers Ford Eastleigh, Hampshire SO53 4DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/31] | McQueen, Andrew Peter Miltons IP - Europe 5th Floor, Broad Quay House Prince Street Bristol BS1 4DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18857560.9 | 18.09.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018US51602 | Priority number, date | US201715710654 | 20.09.2017 Original published format: US201715710654 | US201815902446 | 22.02.2018 Original published format: US201815902446 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019060328 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3685589 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3685589 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/32, H04R1/02, H04R1/34, // H01R13/623, H01R13/62, H01F7/02 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
H04R1/323 (EP);
G10K11/002 (US);
B41M5/0058 (US);
B41M5/0082 (US);
G10K11/20 (US);
H01F7/0252 (EP);
H04R1/021 (EP);
H04R1/025 (US);
H04R1/345 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/39] | H04R1/32, H04R1/02, H04R1/34, // H01R13/623, H01R13/62 | ||
Former IPC [2020/31] | H04R1/02, F16M13/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKBARER DIFFUSOR | [2020/31] | English: | PRINTABLE DIFFUSER | [2020/31] | French: | DIFFUSEUR IMPRIMABLE | [2020/31] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 22.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 09.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 09.05.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2023 | CZ | 14.06.2023 | DK | 14.06.2023 | EE | 14.06.2023 | ES | 14.06.2023 | FI | 14.06.2023 | HR | 14.06.2023 | IT | 14.06.2023 | LT | 14.06.2023 | LV | 14.06.2023 | MC | 14.06.2023 | NL | 14.06.2023 | PL | 14.06.2023 | RO | 14.06.2023 | RS | 14.06.2023 | SE | 14.06.2023 | SI | 14.06.2023 | SK | 14.06.2023 | SM | 14.06.2023 | NO | 14.09.2023 | GR | 15.09.2023 | IE | 18.09.2023 | LU | 18.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | IS | 14.10.2023 | PT | 16.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IE | 18.09.2023 | ||
LU | 18.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IE | 18.09.2023 | ||
LU | 18.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
MC | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
LU | 18.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
IT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
LU | 18.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
LU | 18.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SI | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
DK | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
EE | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
PL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RO | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
PT | 16.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 14.06.2023 | |
CZ | 14.06.2023 | ||
ES | 14.06.2023 | ||
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
IS | 14.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
SK | 14.06.2023 | ||
SM | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
FI | 14.06.2023 | ||
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
LT | 14.06.2023 | ||
LV | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
NL | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
HR | 14.06.2023 | ||
RS | 14.06.2023 | ||
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
GR | 15.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 14.06.2023 | |
SE | 14.06.2023 | ||
NO | 14.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 14.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN202159479U (XIAOSHENG LIN) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2613559 (MONSTER LLC [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claim 4 *; | [A]US2015139454 (CHEN CHIH-HUA [TW]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,4; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US6142254 (CLAYBAUGH DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * Entire document *; | [YA]US2004129492 (BERTAGNI ALEJANDRO [US], et al) [Y] 2, 5, 11 * Entire document especially para [0072] and fig. 3B * [A] 12-16, 19-20; | [A]US2005036646 (GARNER DAVID B [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * Entire document *; | [A]US2005053253 (STERNS FRANK [US]) [A] 1-20 * Entire document *; | [A]US2006177088 (HOWARD R B [US], et al) [A] 6-10, 13-20 * Entire document especially para [0019], [0030]-[0032] and figs. 1-3 *; | [XYA]US2008044053 (BELANGER DONALD [US], et al) [X] 1, 3 * Entire document especially para [0023], [0028]-[0030] and figs. 1-5 * [Y] 2, 5, 11 [A] 4, 6-10, 12-20; | [A]US2013028463 (BAKER DOMINIC [GB]) [A] 1-20 * Entire document *; | [A]US2015139454 (CHEN CHIH-HUA [TW]) [A] 1-20* Entire document *; | [A]US2016107568 (KANG YOON KYU [KR]) [A] 1-20 * Entire document * |