EP3672915 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DOSAGE AND ADMINISTRATION OF LIQUID CHEMICALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meunier Technologies Inc. 4131 rue Vincent Montreal, Québec H9J 1W7 / CA | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TREMBLAY-MEUNIER, Vincent 323 Monseigneur-Prévost Saint-Eustache Québec J7P 2L2 / CA | 02 /
FORTIN HOUDE, Jean-Christophe 219 Shamrock City of Pincourt, Province of Québec J7W 3W3 / CA | [2020/46] |
Former [2020/35] | 01 /
TREMBLAY-MEUNIER, Vincent 323 Monseigneur-Prévost Saint-Eustache Québec J7P 2L2 / CA | ||
02 /
FORTIN HOUDE, Jean-Christophe 219 Shamrock City of Pincourt Province of Québec J7W 3W3 / CA | |||
Former [2020/27] | 01 /
TREMBLAY-MEUNIER, Vincent 323 Monseigneur-Prévost Saint-Eustache Québec J7P 2L2 / CA | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 18857630.0 | 21.09.2018 | [2020/27] | WO2018CA51183 | Priority number, date | US201762562615P | 25.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762562615 P | US201762562630P | 25.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762562630 P | US201862648128P | 26.03.2018 Original published format: US 201862648128 P | US201862653234P | 05.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862653234 P | US201862678660P | 31.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862678660 P | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019056115 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3672915 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3672915 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/00, B01J4/00, C02F1/68 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
C02F1/686 (EP,US);
C02F1/008 (US);
G01F11/28 (EP,US);
G01F25/0092 (EP,US);
G05D16/063 (US);
G05D7/0652 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/27] | C02F1/00, B01J4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DOSIERUNG UND VERABREICHUNG VON FLÜSSIGEN CHEMIKALIEN | [2020/27] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DOSAGE AND ADMINISTRATION OF LIQUID CHEMICALS | [2020/27] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DOSAGE ET D'ADMINISTRATION DE PRODUITS CHIMIQUES LIQUIDES | [2020/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 27.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 21.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA1096353 (ALBERT ROBERT J); | [XI]US2014090731 (HANNAH GARY RAY [US], et al) | International search | [X]US6136196 (WEINBERGER HELMUT [DE]) | by applicant | US2014090731 |