EP3686155 - METHOD FOR GENERATING CHLORINE DIOXIDE GAS, LIQUID COMPOSITION, GEL COMPOSITION, AND CHLORINE DIOXIDE GAS GENERATING KIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLO2 Lab Inc. 3-5 Koyoen Nishiyamacho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 662-0017 / JP | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE Koji c/o CLO2 LAB Inc. 3-5 Koyoen Nishiyamacho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0017 / JP | 02 /
ABE Tsukasa c/o CLO2 LAB Inc. 3-5 Koyoen Nishiyamacho Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo 662-0017 / JP | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/31] | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 15 17 23 80050 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18858647.3 | 28.08.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018JP31726 | Priority number, date | JP20170180688 | 20.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017180688 | JP20180126230 | 02.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018126230 | [2020/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019058892 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686155 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C01B11/02, A61L9/01, A61L9/015 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
C01B11/024 (EP,US);
C01B11/022 (KR);
A01N59/00 (US);
A61L2/20 (US);
A61L2/26 (US);
A61L9/01 (KR);
A61L9/015 (KR);
A61L9/046 (US);
A61L9/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON CHLORDIOXIDGAS, FLÜSSIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, GELZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND CHLORDIOXIDGASERZEUGUNGSKIT | [2020/31] | English: | METHOD FOR GENERATING CHLORINE DIOXIDE GAS, LIQUID COMPOSITION, GEL COMPOSITION, AND CHLORINE DIOXIDE GAS GENERATING KIT | [2020/31] | French: | MÉTHODE DE GÉNÉRATION DE DIOXYDE DE CHLORE GAZEUX, COMPOSITION LIQUIDE, COMPOSITION DE GEL ET KIT DE GÉNÉRATION DE DIOXYDE DE CHLORE GAZEUX | [2020/31] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2020 | Translation filed | 20.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 22.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9639029 (SOUTHWEST RES INST [US]) [A] 1-17* page 20, line 18 - page 22, line 13 *; | [A]US6231830 (MADRAY GEORGE [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 32 * | International search | [A]JPS57168977 (ENCLER BUSINESS KK) [A] 1-17* , *; | [A]WO2008111357 (TAIKO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * , *; | [A]JP2015227320 (CLEANCARE INC) [A] 1-17 * , *; | [A]JP2016088797 (AMATERA:KK) [A] 1-17 * , *; | [A]WO2016201178 (CRYOVAC INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * , page 5 line 18-page 6 line 29, SAMPLE 38 in page 37, page 96 lines 29-32, Table 3 & US 2018/0179058 A1 & EP 3307676 A1 & CN 107949538 A *; | [A]WO2016208758 (INT ENTPR JAPAN INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * , * | by applicant | JP2005029430 |