EP3693626 - RETAINER FOR ROLLING BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTN Corporation 3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0003 / JP | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHASHI, Izumi c/o NTN CORPORATION 1578 Higashikaizuka Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-8510 / JP | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Bockhorni & Brüntjen Partnerschaft Patentanwälte mbB Agnes-Bernauer-Straße 88 80687 München / DE | [2023/35] |
Former [2020/33] | Bockhorni & Brüntjen Partnerschaft Patentanwälte mbB Elsenheimerstraße 49 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18859133.3 | 20.09.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018JP34781 | Priority number, date | JP20170179655 | 20.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017179655 | [2020/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019059268 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3693626 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3693626 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.03.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/46, F16C33/66, F16C9/04, F16C19/26, F16C19/46, F16C33/54 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
F16C33/4605 (EP);
F16C33/4629 (EP);
F16C33/4676 (EP);
F16C33/545 (EP);
F16C33/546 (EP);
F16C33/6681 (EP);
F16C19/26 (EP);
F16C19/463 (EP);
F16C2360/22 (EP);
F16C9/04 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | F16C33/46, F16C33/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTER FÜR WÄLZLAGER | [2020/36] | English: | RETAINER FOR ROLLING BEARING | [2020/33] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE RETENUE POUR PALIER À ROULEMENT | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/33] | HALTER FUR WALZLAGER | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2020 | Translation filed | 19.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 25.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2023 | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | IE | 20.09.2023 | LU | 20.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
IE | 20.09.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
IE | 20.09.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
MC | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
LU | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
CZ | 30.08.2023 | ||
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 30.08.2023 | |
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1725627U (ROULEMENTS A AIGUELLES SA DES [FR]) [X] 1-4 * figures 3, 7b *; | [X]FR1234778 (ROULEMENTS A AIGUILLES SA) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1, 3 *; | [X]GB919983 (PITNER ALFRED, et al) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 4, 6 *; | [X]DE1963209U (DUERKOPPWERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1, 2 *; | [X]JP2004011689 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [X] 1,3 * figure 2 *; | [X]DE102008026562 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0009]; figures 3, 4 *; | [X]WO2010018663 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 1A, 1B *; | [X]US2010322549 (BROWN MICHAEL G [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 3, 4 *; | [X]DE102014214332 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1-4* figures 1, 2 * | International search | [Y]JPH07167135 (NIPPON THOMPSON CO LTD) [Y] 4 * , *; | [A]JPH07259865 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [A] 1-4* , *; | [Y]JPH08270658 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [Y] 1-4 * , *; | [Y]JP2007064305 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [Y] 1-4 * , *; | [Y]JP2010286117 (KOYO BEARINGS USA LLC) [Y] 1-4 * , * | by applicant | JPH08312650 | JP2007064305 |