EP3687981 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NATHANSON, David, A. 11728 Wilshire Blvd. Los Angeles, CA 90025 / US | 02 /
MAI, Wilson, X. c/o The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street Twelfth Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | 03 /
JUNG, Michael, E. 2335 Manning Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90064 / US | 04 /
CLARK, Peter, M. 827 Levering Ave. Apt. 614 Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | 05 /
CLOUGHESY, Timothy, F. 25570 Prado De Oro Calabasas, CA 91302 / US | 06 /
KIM, Gyudong 05-401, 85, Sindaebang-gil Dongjak-gu Seoul 07069 / KR | 07 /
TSANG, Jonathan 3160 Sawtelle Blvd. Apt. 207 Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | 08 /
URNER, Lorenz 10824 Lindbrook Dr. 304 Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18860554.7 | 26.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018US52858 | Priority number, date | US201762563373P | 26.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762563373 P | US201762589972P | 22.11.2017 Original published format: US 201762589972 P | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019067543 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3687981 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/94, C07D317/48, C07D319/18, C07D321/08, A61K31/519, A61K31/55, A61P35/00 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
C07D239/95 (EP,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/403 (EP);
A61K31/4035 (KR);
A61K31/496 (KR,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/55 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07D239/94 (EP);
C07D405/04 (EP);
C07D405/10 (US);
C07D491/056 (EP,US);
G01N33/5011 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/403, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/40, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2020/32] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING CANCER | [2020/32] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 01.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CN1854130 (PHARMACEUTICAL INST CHINA ACAD [CN]); | [X]WO2008046242 (INST OF MATARIA MEDICA CHINESE [CN], et al); | [X]US7521456 (ALLEN DOUGLAS JOHN MELDRUM [US], et al); | [X]WO2012127012 (UNIV PADOVA [IT], et al); | [X]US8916574 (WANG JINGYI [CN], et al); | [X]CN105017163 (FOSHAN SAIWEISI MEDICINE SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [X]WO2016100347 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US]); | [X]CN106432202 (FIRST AFFILIATED HOSPITAL ZHENGZHOU UNIV); | [X]WO2017117680 (TRILLIUM THERAPEUTICS INC [CA]); |