EP3688574 - SYSTEM VERSION UPGRADING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town, Grand Cayman / KY | [2020/40] |
Former [2020/32] | For all designated states C-Sky Microsystems Co., Ltd. 15F Building A Tiantang Software Park No.3 Xidoumen Road Xihu District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310012 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Xianshao 15F Building A Tiantang Software Park No.3 Xidoumen Road, Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310012 / CN | 02 /
GU, Yucan 15F Building A Tiantang Software Park No.3 Xidoumen Road, Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310012 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Jiaqi 15F Building A Tiantang Software Park No.3 Xidoumen Road, Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310012 / CN | 04 /
CUI, Jiuchao 15F Building A Tiantang Software Park No.3 Xidoumen Road, Xihu District Hangzhou Zhejiang 310012 / CN | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18862066.0 | 26.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018CN107674 | Priority number, date | CN201710881265 | 26.09.2017 Original published format: CN201710881265 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019062770 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3688574 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3688574 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/65, G06F8/71, G06F11/14 | [2020/46] | CPC: |
G06F8/65 (EP,CN);
G06F8/71 (EP,CN)
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | G06F8/65, G06F8/71 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM UPGRADE EINER SYSTEMVERSION | [2020/32] | English: | SYSTEM VERSION UPGRADING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2020/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE MISE À NIVEAU DE VERSION DE SYSTÈME | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 11.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009156302 (NXP BV [NL], et al); | [I]US8745612 (SEMENZATO LUIGI [US], et al) | Examination | US2008244556 |