EP3691247 - INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Semiconductor Solutions Corporation 4-14-1, Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OOTA, Yoshinori c/o SONY SEMICONDUCTOR SOLUTIONS CORPORATION 4-14-1 Asahi-cho Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0014 / JP | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18862833.3 | 26.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018JP35737 | Priority number, date | US201762563220P | 26.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762563220 P | [2020/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019065757 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3691247 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232, H04N5/247, H04N7/18, G06K9/00, G06T7/292 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
H04N7/181 (EP);
G06T7/292 (EP,KR);
H04N23/60 (EP,US);
G06V20/13 (EP,US);
G06V20/17 (EP,US);
G06V20/52 (EP,US);
H04N23/611 (EP);
H04N23/62 (KR);
H04N23/661 (EP,KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | H04N5/232, H04N5/247, H04N7/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM | [2020/32] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2020/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2020 | Translation filed | 14.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 02.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2453412 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [I]KR20120054971 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]); | [I]US2015338497 (KWON KI-SANG [KR], et al) | International search | [Y]JP2016010145 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP); | [Y]WO2016157327 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [XY]JP2016213808 (PANASONIC IP MAN CORP) | by applicant | JP2018121163 |