EP3690478 - RADAR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 2-11-2 Tsurumaki Tama-Shi, Tokyo 206-8567 / JP | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOJIMA, Akihiko c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 2-11-2, Tsurumaki, Tama-shi Tokyo 206-8567 / JP | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Lambsdorff & Lange Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Grillparzerstraße 12A 81675 München / DE | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18862930.7 | 20.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018JP34787 | Priority number, date | JP20170191213 | 29.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017191213 | [2020/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019065440 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3690478 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/42, G01S7/03, G01S13/34, G01S7/02, G01S13/931 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
G01S7/0232 (EP);
G01S13/424 (EP,US);
G01S13/343 (EP);
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G01S7/03 (EP);
G01S7/354 (US);
H01Q3/22 (US);
G01S13/345 (EP);
G01S2013/93271 (EP,US);
G01S7/356 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | G01S13/42, G01S7/03, G01S13/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | RADARVORRICHTUNG | [2020/32] | English: | RADAR DEVICE | [2020/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF RADAR | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2020 | Translation filed | 21.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 04.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/23] | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE10253808 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0016] , [0022] - [0024] - [0047]; figures 1-4 *; | [XI]WO2007032234 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0 32] - [0043]; figures 1-6 * * paragraphs [0085] , [0086]; figure 16 * [I] 4; | [I]DE102008054624 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 1-5* paragraphs [0023] - [0033]; figures 1-4 *; | [I]DE102010001761 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0017] - [0040]; figures 1-5; claim 10 *; | [X]DE102014212281 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0046] - [0076]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [Y]JP2004198323 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 4 * [0031]-[0084], 1-10 * & US 2005/0093735 A1 * [0108]-[0216], FIG.1-11 * & DE 10356797 A1 *; | [A]JP2004198438 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [A] 1-5; | [XY]WO2007032234 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-2 [Y] 4-5; | [A]JP2012512387 [A] 1-5 * & US 2012/0169525 A1 & WO 2010/072437 A1 & DE *; | [A]WO2012089385 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-5* * & US 2014/0104097 A1 & DE 102010064348 A1 & CN 103299207 A *; | [Y]JP2015042962 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [Y] 5; | [A]JP2016206158 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [A] 1-5 | by applicant | JPS6414749 | JPH0563427 | JPH05107340 | JP2000206234 | JP2005207837 | JP2010112879 | JP2017191213 |