EP3689809 - CRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2023 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tadano Ltd. Ko-34, Shindencho Takamatsu-shi, Kagawa 761-0185 / JP | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANDA Shinsuke c/o TADANO LTD. Ko-34 Shinden-cho Takamatsu-shi Kagawa 761-0185 / JP | 02 /
MIZUKI Kazuma c/o TADANO LTD. Ko-34 Shinden-cho Takamatsu-shi Kagawa 761-0185 / JP | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18863065.1 | 28.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018JP36414 | Priority number, date | JP20170192193 | 29.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017192193 | [2020/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019066018 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689809 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/00, B66C13/22, B66C13/06, B66C23/70 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
B66C13/063 (EP,US);
B66C13/066 (EP,US);
B66C13/22 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | B66C23/00, B66C13/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | KRAN | [2020/32] | English: | CRANE | [2020/32] | French: | GRUE | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2020 | Translation filed | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2011119037 (NAT OILWELL VARCO NORWAY AS [NO], et al) [X] 1 * page 9 - page 17; figure - * [Y] 3,4 [I] 2; | [Y]US2014067111 (VITOVSKY MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 3,4* paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0136]; figure - * | International search | [A]JPH0891774 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-4 * , paragraph [0067] (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH10120367 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0006]-[0010] (Family: none) *; | [A]US5908122 (ROBINETT RUSH D [US], et al) [A] 1-4* , column 9, line 28 to column 17, line 37, fig. 1-6 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2005012155 (SINTOKOGIO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0026]-[0059], fig. 1-4 & EP 1652810 A1 & CN 1832898 A & US 2008/0275610 A1, paragraphs [0032]-[0063], fig. 1-4 *; | [A]JP2005067747 (NISHIMURA HIDEKAZU, et al) [A] 1-4 * , paragraphs [0024]-[0061], fig. 1-17 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016160081 (JFE ENG CORP) [A] 1-4 * , paragraph [0038] (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2016160081 |