EP3688094 - POLYMER FILM-METAL COMPOSITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Research Council of Canada 1200 Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1A 0R6 / CA | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALIC, Lidija 7022 27e Avenue Apt 6 Saint Leonard Québec H1S 0A2 / CA | 02 /
ZHANG, Xuefeng 336 Rue de Gascogne Boucherville Québec J4B 8T2 / CA | 03 /
MORTON, Keith 1760 Rue du Verdun Saint Bruno Québec J3V 3J9 / CA | 04 /
VERES, Teodor 4952 Chemin de la Cote des Neiges Montreal Québec H3V 1H2 / CA | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18863703.7 | 25.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018CA51203 | Priority number, date | US201762563170P | 26.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762563170 P | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019060990 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3688094 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L51/08, B82Y30/00, C08F2/44, C08F2/46, C08J3/20, C08K3/08, C08K7/18, C22B5/00 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
C08F290/062 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/004 (KR);
B33Y40/00 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/44 (EP,KR);
C08F2/46 (EP,KR);
C08F222/102 (US);
C08F222/103 (KR);
C08J7/044 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/08 (EP,KR,US);
C08L51/08 (EP,KR);
G03F7/0002 (EP,KR);
G03F7/0037 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0043 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/027 (EP,KR);
G03F7/0275 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/028 (US);
G03F7/0285 (EP,KR);
G03F7/031 (EP,KR);
G03F7/033 (EP,KR);
G03F7/0755 (EP,KR);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C08J2333/08 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F290/062, C08F222/103 (EP);
C08K3/08, C08L51/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | POLYMERFILM-METALLVERBUNDWERKSTOFFE | [2020/32] | English: | POLYMER FILM-METAL COMPOSITES | [2020/32] | French: | COMPOSITES FILM POLYMÈRE-MÉTAL | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 23.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/21] | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2012129133 (MARUZEN PETROCHEM CO LTD) [X] 1,2,9 * example 1 * [I] 7; | [X]WO2014149805 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 8,10-15 * page 31 - page 32; claim 1 *; | [XI]EP3073321 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * example 2 * [I] 3-6; | [XP]KR20170124022 (KNU-INDUSTRY COOPERATION FOUND [KR]) [XP] 14,15* the whole document *; | [A] - SHAW C. FRANK ET AL, "Gold(III) oxidation of disulfides in aqueous solution", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, Easton , US, (19801001), vol. 19, no. 10, doi:10.1021/ic50212a080, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 3198 - 3201, XP055808561 [A] 8,10-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic50212a080 | International search | [X]US2013156645 (HONG CHIEN-CHONG [TW], et al) [X] 35, 43-48, 50, 52-53 * Entire document, especially, para [0011], [0014], [0043]-[0048], [0055], [0057]-[0058], claims 1, 2, 5, 7-10, 14 *; | [X]WO2014139031 (UNIV CONCORDIA [CA]) [X] 40, 43-50* Entire document, especially p. 2(line 1-5, 14-25), p. 4 (line 16-23), p. 6 (line 8-9), p. 7 (line 19-26), claims *; | [X] - TENORIO-NETO et al., "Synthesis and characterization of silver nanoparticle nanocomposite thin films with thermally induced surface morphology changes", Materials Letters, (20150630), vol. 159, pages 118 - 121, XP055588006 [X] 1, 2, 8, 11-16, 19, 23, 34, 40, 43, 44, 47, 49-53 * Entire document, especially abstract, para 2.2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matlet.2015.06.095 | [X] - SWAMINATHAN IYER et al., "Reversible submergence of nanoparticles into ultrathin block copolymer films", Soft Matter, (20110101), vol. 7, no. 6, ISSN 1744-683X, page 2538, XP055588007 [X] 40 * Abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0sm01156h | [X] - KUDRYASHOV, M. A. et al., "Morphology of a SilverlPolyacrylonitrile Nanocomposite", Technical Physics, (20110101), vol. 56, no. 1, ISSN 1063-7842, page 92, XP055588008 [X] 40 * Entire document, especially abstract, page 92, left column * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1134/S1063784211010154 |