EP3687849 - FAIL-SAFE OPTICAL WIRELESS POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wi-Charge Ltd. 3 Pekeris Street Rehovot 7670203 / IL | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALPERT, Ortal 37 Bialik Street 7402001 Ness Ziona / IL | 02 /
GOLAN, Lior 16 Dov Friedman Street 5250308 Ramat Gan / IL | 03 /
MOR, Ori 14 Hamishna Street 6291006 Tel Aviv / IL | 04 /
SAGI, Ran 23 Bruria Street 6745461 Tel Aviv / IL | 05 /
NAHMIAS, Omer 225 Ha'egoz Street 9088500 Aminadav / IL | 06 /
ASHUSH, Yoram 14 Frishman Street 4942426 Petach Tikveh / IL | 07 /
BIDERMAN, Yoav 2 Hafetz Haim Street 6745655 Tel Aviv / IL | 08 /
MILLS-LEVIN, Zohar 25 Har Hatzofim Street 7662037 Rehovot / IL | 09 /
ROSH, Yan 4 Yakhin Street 5249129 Tel Aviv / IL | 10 /
CONFORTI, Eyal 17 Hahaskala Street 6789036 Tel Aviv / IL | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Gabriella Diana, et al Modiano & Partners (DE) Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18863738.3 | 28.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018IL51073 | Priority number, date | US201762564428P | 28.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762564428 P | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019064305 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3687849 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3687849 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/80, B60L3/12, H04B5/00 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
H04B10/807 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/30 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/60 (EP);
H02J50/80 (EP);
H02J7/02 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/32] | B60L3/12, H04B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSFALLSICHERE OPTISCHE DRAHTLOSE STROMVERSORGUNG | [2020/32] | English: | FAIL-SAFE OPTICAL WIRELESS POWER SUPPLY | [2020/32] | French: | ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE OPTIQUE SANS FIL À SÉCURITÉ INTÉGRÉE | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 30.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23217954.9 / EP4351026 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   15.11.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5771114 (ANDERSSON ANDERS G [US], et al); | [A]US2010079011 (HYDE RODERICK A [US], et al); | [A]US2017093228 (FISHER BRENT [US], et al) | International search | [A]US7068991 (PARISE RONALD J [US]); | [A]US2015255994 (KESLER MORRIS P [US], et al); | [A]US2016013656 (BELL DOUGLAS [US], et al); | [A]US9312701 (MOR ORI REFAEL [IL], et al); | [A]US2017019180 (LUCRECIO ARMANDO J [US], et al); | [A]US2017093228 (FISHER BRENT [US], et al) |