EP3691632 - COMPOSITIONS, METHODS, SYSTEMS AND/OR KITS FOR PREVENTING AND/OR TREATING NEOPLASMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research Cancer Institute of America 1680 E. Herndon Ave. 102 Fresno, California 93720 / US | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEZAMI, Mohammed, Amin 1680 E. Herndon Ave. 102 Fresno CA 93720 / US | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 18863859.7 | 05.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018US54753 | Priority number, date | US201762569413P | 06.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762569413 P | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019071229 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3691632 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/353, A61K36/82, A61P35/04, A61K9/51, A61K31/495, A61K31/352 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61K9/513 (US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/352 (EP);
A61K31/353 (EP,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K9/5146 (EP);
A61K9/5153 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/192, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/353, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/495, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/21] | A61K31/353, A61K36/82, A61P35/04, A61K9/51, A61K31/495 | ||
Former IPC [2020/33] | A61K31/353, A61K36/82, A61P35/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN, SYSTEME UND/ODER KITS ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND/ODER BEHANDLUNG VON NEOPLASMEN | [2020/33] | English: | COMPOSITIONS, METHODS, SYSTEMS AND/OR KITS FOR PREVENTING AND/OR TREATING NEOPLASMS | [2020/33] | French: | COMPOSITIONS, MÉTHODES, SYSTÈMES ET/OU KITS DE PRÉVENTION ET/OU DE TRAITEMENT DE NÉOPLASMES | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 16.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2014091078 (FILANA LTD OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2014111268 (ALTERGON SA [CH]) [A] 1-15* claim - *; | [XI] - GAO XIANG ET AL, "Enhancing the anti-colon cancer activity of quercetin by self-assembled micelles", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF NANOMEDICINE, AUCKLAND, NZ, doi:10.2147/IJN.S75550, ISSN 1176-9114, (20150316), page 2051, URL: https://doi.org/10.2147/IJN.S75550, (20210415), XP055795401 [X] 1,2,4,9-12,14 * the whole document * [I] 3,5-8,13,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/IJN.S75550 | International search | [A]WO2007121088 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-2, 3/1-2, 10/3/1-2* ; entire document *; | [X]US2013011488 (NEZAMI MD MOHAMMAD [US]) [X] 1-2, 3/1-2, 10/3/1-2 * ; paragraphs [0004], [0006], [0035] * | by applicant | WO2014091078 | US9308270 | - MOUSA S.A.BHARALI D.J., "Nanotechnology-Based Detection and Targeted Therapy in Cancer: Nano-Bio Paradigms and Applications", Cancers (Basel, (20110900), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 2888 - 2903 | - MOUSA S.A., "Emerging nanomedicines for early cancer detection and improved treatment: current perspective and future promise", Pharmacology & Therapeutics, (20101100), vol. 128, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.pharmthera.2010.07.007, pages 324 - 335, XP055099250 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pharmthera.2010.07.007 | - BHARALI D.J. et al., "Nanoparticles and cancer therapy: a concise review with emphasis on dendrimers", International Journal of Nanomedicine, (20090401), vol. 4, pages 1 - 7 |