EP3691473 - POTATO EMULSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veg Of Lund AB Södra Vallgatan 5 211 40 Malmö / SE | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORNBERG, Eva Rinnebäcksvägen 13 227 31 Lund / SE | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 18863897.7 | 02.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018SE51007 | Priority number, date | SE20170051224 | 04.10.2017 Original published format: SE 1751224 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019070186 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3691473 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A23L19/15, A23L2/02, A23L19/12, A23L23/10, A23L2/52, A23L19/00, A23L35/00 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
A23L19/15 (EP,SE,US);
A23L19/09 (EP,US);
A23L19/12 (EP,SE);
A23L19/14 (EP);
A23L2/02 (EP,SE,US);
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | A23L19/15, A23L2/02, A23L19/12, A23L23/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | KARTOFFELEMULSION | [2020/33] | English: | POTATO EMULSION | [2020/33] | French: | ÉMULSION DE POMME DE TERRE | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 08.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2022 | Observations by third parties | 07.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/37] | 11.05.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6485775 (CAMIN HENRY J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 9 - column 16, line 13; example - *; | [XDI]SE534856 (PHENOLIV AB [SE]) [XD] 1-3,8-10 * page 1, line 5 - page 7, line 24; table - * [I] 4-7; | [T] - Anonymous, "Äppelmos EKO 375 g > Björnekulla", https://www.bjornekulla.se, (20140507), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20140507001437/https:/www.bjornekulla.se/product/appelmos-eko-375-g/, (20201214), XP055759413 [T] * page 1 * | International search | [A]WO0022939 (BASIC AMERICAN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11* ; abstract; claims *; | [A]US6485775 (CAMIN HENRY J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * ; abstract; claims *; | [XY]SE1050965 (PHENOLIV AB [SE]) [X] 1-7, 9-11 * ; abstract; page 5, line 25 - page 5, line 29; page 6, line 17 - page 6, line 18; claims; example 1, 3 * [Y] 8; | [A]CN106962942 (INSTITUTE OF AGRO-FOOD SCIENCE AND TECH CHINESE ACADEMY OF AGRICULTURAL SCIENCES) [A] 1-11 * ; (abstract) Retrieved from: EPODOC and WPI database; Original document: claims *; | [XY] - Alfredsson, Emma, "The Manufacture of a Vegetarian Smoothie", Thesis, (20100000), pages 1 - 53, XP009519890 [X] 1-7, 9-11 * ; 3.1.4. Fruit and Berries; 3.2.4.2 Mixing; 4.4.2. Particle size in Potato-Apple emulsions formed by mixing with Rape&Flax seed oil; 4.8 Remarks * [Y] 8 | [A] - "Appelmos EKO 375g", Bjornekulla, URL: https://www.bjornekulla.se/product/appelmos-eko-375-g, (20180418) [A] 1-11 * ; whole document * | [Y] - Lamberti M; Geiselmann A; Conde-Petit B; Escher F, "Starch transformation and structure development in production and reconstitution of potato flakes", LWT- Food Science and Technology, (20040630), vol. 37, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.lwt.2003.10.015, ISSN 0023-6438, pages 417 - 427, XP055591713 [Y] 8 * .; figures 1, 3h; 2.1 Production of potato flakes; 3.2 Changes of cell and starch microstructure; * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.lwt.2003.10.015 | other | - Van Marle Netty, "Characterization of changes in potato tissue during cooking in relation to texture development", Thesis Landbouwuniversiteit Wageningen, (19970205), pages 1 - 136, URL: https://edepot.wur.nl/200362, XP055943062 | - Velásquez et al., "Physical-chemical characteristics determination of potato (Solanum phureja Juz. & Bukasov) starch", Acta Agronómica, (20170101), vol. 66, no. 3, doi:10.15446/acag.v66n3.52419, ISSN 0120-2812, pages 323 - 330, XP055934865 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.15446/acag.v66n3.52419 | - Baranowska et al., "Emulsions stabilized using potato starch", Food Science and Biotechnology, Heidelberg , (20150831), vol. 24, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s10068-015-0152-6, ISSN 1226-7708, pages 1187 - 1191, XP035523172 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10068-015-0152-6 | - "Potato Starch-Superior Standard | RadchenUSA", (20160318), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20160318211048/https://radchenusa.com/potato-starch-superior-standard/, XP055943071 | - "pasteurization ", Britannica Online Encyclopedia, (20210504), URL: https://www.britannica.com/print/article/446003, XP055943078 | - Mcintyre Lorraine, "Guideline for restaurant sous vide cooking safety in British Columbia", doi:10.13140/rg.2.1.3965.5126, (20151001), pages 1 - 46, URL: https://www.researchgate.net/publication/282366282_Guideline_for_restaurant_sous_vide_cooking_safety_in_British_Columbia, XP055943107 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.13140/rg.2.1.3965.5126 | - SR living (Socias y Rossello Magazine), (20170101), pages 38 - 39, URL: https://pro.sociasyrossello.es/upload/513pdf_file02_08_02.pdf, XP055943119 | - "Paprika Tap de Cortí ", Wikipedia, (20211029), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Paprika_Tap_de_Cortí, XP055943123 | - "Braisenville | Paris Update", (20130109), URL: https://www.parisupdate.com/braisenville/, XP055943125 | - Kirchsteiger Ernst, "Anchochilikryddad tomat- och potatissås | Köket.se", (20160901), URL: https://www.koket.se/anchochilikryddad-tomat-och-potatissas, XP055943136 | - Mrga, "Mayonesa Vegana de patata | Recetas de Salsas y Patés Vegetarianos y Veganos", (20140101), URL: https://www.vegaffinity.com/comunidad/receta/mayonesa-vegana-de-patata--r483, XP055943141 | - Romina Villarroel P, "Papanesa o mayonesa de papa 🥔 Receta de Villarroel P Romina- Cookpad", (20170803), URL: https://cookpad.com/co/recetas/3101487-papanesa-o-mayonesa-de-papa, XP055943145 | - Maite Sastre, "Alioli de patata (vegano y sin gluten)", URL: https://www.antojoentucocina.com/receta/alioli-patata | - "Mayonesa de papa y zanahoria", URL: https://www.solovegetales.com/mayonesa-con-vegetales-1851/ | - Annie B. Shapero, "A Matter of Taste: Potato Milk", URL: https://www.amexessentials.com/potato-milk-recipe-potato-milk-trend/ | - The Green Creator, "HOW TO MAKE POTATO MILK", Youtube, (20210805), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=g4pdV2038r4, XP055943230 | - Fleming Alisa, "Potato Milk: Plant-Based Milk Alternative (Dairy-Free)", (20070606), URL: https://www.godairyfree.org/recipes/milk-subs/potato-milk-vegan-gluten-free-soy-free, XP055943237 | - Body and Mind staff, "Milk substitutes: potato milk - pennlive.com", (20121102), URL: https://www.pennlive.com/bodyandmind/2012/11/milk_substitutes_potato_milk.html, XP055943239 | - Fleming Alisa, "Potato Milk (Vegan, Gluten-Free, Soy-Free) - Go Dairy Free", (20130217), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20130217132456/https://www.godairyfree.org/recipes/milk-subs/potato-milk-vegan-gluten-free-soy-free, XP055943242 | - "Potato Milk", URL: https://almondcow.co/recipes/milk-recipes/potato-milk | - JoSele Swopes, "How To Substitute Milk For Milk Powder", URL: https://www.justapinch.com/recipes/dessert/cake/how-to-substitute-milk-for-milk-powder.html | - American Academy Of Pediatrics Recommendations, "PEDIATRIC MILK SUBSTITUTE GUIDELINES ", (20160801), URL: https://www.dellchildrens.net/wp-content/uploads/sites/60/2016/08/Pediatric-Milk-Substitute-Recommendations.pdf, XP055943253 | - Anonymous, "Potato milk - anterrabae", (20130131), URL: https://anterrabae.wordpress.com/2013/01/31/potatismjolk/, XP055943258 | - Anterrabae, "Potato milk", (20130131), URL: https://vegan.ifokus.se/discussion/967305/potatismjolk |