EP3692470 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MACHINE LEARNING-DRIVEN OBJECT DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Angel Group Co., Ltd. 4600 Aono-cho Higashiomi-shi, Shiga 527-0232 / JP | [2023/52] |
Former [2020/33] | For all designated states Sensen Networks Group Pty Ltd Level 1, 9 Harper Street Abbotsford, Victoria 3067 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VO, Nhat Level 1, 9 Harper Street Abbotsford Victoria 3067 / AU | 02 /
CHALLA, Subhash Level 1, 9 Harper Street Abbotsford Victoria 3067 / AU | 03 /
QUINN, Louis Level 1, 9 Harper Street Abbotsford Victoria 3067 / AU | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte, et al Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18863907.4 | 02.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018AU51071 | Priority number, date | AU20170903975 | 02.10.2017 Original published format: AU 2017903975 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019068141 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3692470 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/62, G06T7/10, G06K9/00, G06T7/12, G06T7/13, G06T7/136, G06T7/155, G06T7/73 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
G06T7/12 (EP,KR,US);
G07F17/3206 (AU,KR,US);
G06V20/40 (AU,KR);
G06F18/21 (US);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06N3/045 (US);
G06N3/08 (AU,KR,US);
G06T7/11 (US);
G06T7/13 (EP,KR);
G06T7/136 (EP,KR);
G06T7/155 (EP,KR);
G06T7/73 (EP,KR);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V20/52 (EP,KR,US);
G06V40/103 (AU,KR,US);
G07F17/322 (AU,KR);
G07F17/3248 (AU,KR);
H04N7/183 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | G06K9/62, G06T7/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR OBJEKTERKENNUNG DURCH MASCHINENLERNEN | [2020/33] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MACHINE LEARNING-DRIVEN OBJECT DETECTION | [2020/33] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'OBJETS GUIDÉE PAR APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 29.01.2021 | Observations by third parties | 03.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017039807 (SHIGETA YASUSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,11-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] , [ 0033] * * paragraphs [0067] , [0069] * * paragraphs [0070] , [0073] , [0078] * * paragraphs [0084] , [0085] , [0090] * * paragraphs [0107] , [0112] *[I] 3-6,9,10 | International search | [XY]US2006252554 (GURURAJAN PREM [CA], et al) [X] 1-9, 13-19, 22-28 * abstract, paragraphs [0057, 0060-0062, 0068, 0074, 0080, 0104, 0125, 0127, 0155, 0168] paragraphs [0057, 0060-0062, 0068, 0074, 0080, 0104, 0125, 0127, 0155, 0168] * [Y] 10, 12, 20, 21; | [XY]US2007077987 (GURURAJAN PREM [CA], et al) [X] 1-9, 13-19, 22-28 * paragraphs [0006, 0007, 0016, 0049, 0053, 0054, 0071, 0123, 0124, 0141, 0154] paragraphs [0006, 0007, 0016, 0049, 0053, 0054, 0071, 0123, 0124, 0141, 0154] * [Y] 10, 12, 20, 21; | [A]EP1335783 (PROGRESSIVE GAMING INT CO [US]) [A] * whole document *; | [A]US2017069159 (VIKRANTH GOPI B [US], et al) [A] * whole document *; | [A]US2017124415 (CHOI WONGUN [US], et al) [A] * whole document *; | [Y]US2017206431 (SUN JIAN [CN], et al) [Y] 10, 12, 20, 21 * paragraphs [0016, 0044, 0045, 0120-0128, 0130] * | by applicant | US2017039807 | other | US2017039807 |