EP3693453 - CELL CAPTURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOK Corporation 12-15, Shiba-Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8585 / JP | For all designated states The University Of Tokyo 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMORI, Takayuki c/o NOK Corporation 4-3-1 Tsujidoshinmachi Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0042 / JP | 02 /
KIM, SooHyeon c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | 03 /
FUJII, Teruo c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | [2024/11] |
Former [2020/33] | 01 /
KOMORI Takayuki c/o NOK Corporation 4-3-1 Tsujidoshinmachi Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0042 / JP | ||
02 /
KIM SooHyeon c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | |||
03 /
FUJII Teruo c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF TOKYO 3-1 Hongo 7-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8654 / JP | Representative(s) | Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 18863997.5 | 02.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018JP36826 | Priority number, date | JP20170193145 | 03.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017193145 | [2020/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019069900 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3693453 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3693453 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/26, C12M3/08, B01L3/00 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
B01L3/502761 (EP,US);
C12M47/04 (US);
B01L3/50273 (US);
B01L3/502753 (US);
C12M1/26 (EP);
C12M3/08 (EP);
B01L2200/0647 (US);
B01L2200/0652 (EP);
B01L2200/0668 (EP);
B01L2300/041 (US);
B01L2300/06 (US);
B01L2300/0645 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0809 (US);
B01L2300/0874 (EP);
B01L2300/0883 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0887 (EP);
B01L2300/123 (EP,US);
B01L2300/168 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | C12M1/26, C12M3/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLENERFASSUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/33] | English: | CELL CAPTURING DEVICE | [2020/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CAPTURE DE CELLULES | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2020 | Translation filed | 31.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 31.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5690763 (ASHMEAD JAMES WILLIAM [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-6,9-16 * figure 2 *; | [Y]WO2004034028 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US]) [Y] 1,3-6,9-16 * figures 2-4 *; | [Y]WO2006108101 (LIVING MICROSYSTEMS [US], et al) [Y] 2* page 19, lines 21-31; figures 1-30 *; | [Y]WO2012020711 (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,7,8 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2014247971 (BHARADWAJ RAJIV [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0015] - [0025] - [0036] , [0046]; figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]JP2010004870 (UNIV TOKYO) [A] 1-16 * , *; | [A]JP2011000079 (UNIV TOKYO) [A] 1-16 * , *; | [A]WO2012020711 (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * . *; | [A]JP2012239449 (UNIV NAGOYA, et al) [A] 1-16 * , *; | [A]WO2016136273 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16* , & US 2018/0038876 A1 & EP 3263693 A1 *; | [XP] - Komori, Takayuki et al.,, "Cell Separating/Trapping Device for Analysis of Rare Cells", Abstracts of 36th Technical Meeting of the Society for Chemical and Micro-Nano Systems (36th CHEMINAS), (20171004), vol. 36, page 40, XP009519852 [XP] 1-16 | [A] - Tottori, Naotomo et al.,, "A Deterministic Lateral Displacement Microfluidic Device for Continuous Separation of Satellite Droplets", Proceedings of 2016 JSPE Spring Conference, (20160000), doi:10.11522/pscjspe.2016S.0_327, pages 327 - 328, XP055683130 [A] 1-16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.11522/pscjspe.2016S.0_327 | by applicant | JP2012034641 | WO2016136273 | JP2017093359 | - "Development of a System Utilizing Dielectrophoresis for Detection and Analysis of Rare Tumor Cells in Peripheral Blood", TOSHIFUMI MOGAMI et al., TOSOH Research & Technology Review, Tosoh Corporation, (20140000), vol. 58, pages 3 - 12 | - "Development of Deterministic Lateral Displacement Device for Separation of Particles", TOTTORI NAOTOMO et al., Proceedings of the Academic Lecture of the Spring Meeting of the Japan Society for Precision Engineering Society of 2015, The Japan Society for Precision Engineering, (20150000), pages 743 - 744 |