EP3693719 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A DISPERSION LIQUID FOR FIBER LENGTH MEASUREMENT, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PREPARATION FOR FIBER LENGTH MEASUREMENT, METHOD FOR MEASURING A FIBER LENGTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/33] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING PREPARED SLIDE FOR FIBER LENGTH MEASUREMENT, METHOD FOR ADJUSTING DISPERSION LIQUID FOR FIBER LENGTH MEASUREMENT, METHOD FOR MEASURING FIBER LENGTH, PREPARED SLIDE FOR FIBER LENGTH MEASUREMENT, DEVICE FOR MEASURING FIBER LENGTH, AND PROGRAM THAT CONTROLS DEVICE FOR MEASURING FIBER LENGTH | ||
[2023/50] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Tokai National Higher Education and Research System 1, Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [2023/06] |
Former [2020/48] | For all designated states National University Corporation Tokai National Higher Education and Research System 1, Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-8601 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | |||
For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | |||
For all designated states Kyowa Industrial Co., Ltd. 18-18 Sugue-cho 4-chome Sanjo-shi, Niigata 955-0832 / JP | |||
Former [2020/33] | For all designated states National University Corporation Nagoya University 1, Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 464-8601 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toray Industries, Inc. 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | |||
For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | |||
For all designated states Kyowa Industrial Co., Ltd. 18-18 Sugue-cho 4-chome Sanjo-shi, Niigata 955-0832 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TERADA, Mariko c/o National University Corporation Nagoya University 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-0601 / JP | 02 /
YAMANAKA, Atsuhiko c/o National University Corporation Nagoya University 1 Furo-cho Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 464-0601 / JP | 03 /
KIMOTO, Yukitane c/o Nagoya Plant Toray Industries, Inc. 9-1 Oe-cho Minato-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 455-8502 / JP | 04 /
SHIRAKI, Koji c/o Teijin Limited 234 Kamitogari Nagaizumi-cho Sunto-gun Shizuoka 411-8720 / JP | 05 /
HOTTA, Yuji c/o Chubu Center National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 2266-98 Aza Anagahora, Oaza Shimoshidami, Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 463-8560 / JP | 06 /
SHIMAMOTO, Daisuke c/o Chubu Center National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 2266-98 Aza Anagahora, Oaza Shimoshidami, Moriyama-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 463-8560 / JP | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 18864661.6 | 02.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018JP36949 | Priority number, date | JP20170193770 | 03.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017193770 | [2020/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019069954 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3693719 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28, G01B11/02, G01N1/38 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
G01N1/2813 (EP,KR);
G01N1/38 (EP,KR,US);
G01B11/02 (EP,US);
G01B11/022 (KR);
G01N1/4022 (EP,KR);
G01N1/4055 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | G01N1/28, G01B11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DISPERSIONSFLÜSSIGKEIT ZUR FASERLÄNGENMESSUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PRÄPARATES ZUR FASERLÄNGENMESSUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG EINER FASERLÄNGE | [2023/50] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING A DISPERSION LIQUID FOR FIBER LENGTH MEASUREMENT, METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PREPARATION FOR FIBER LENGTH MEASUREMENT, METHOD FOR MEASURING A FIBER LENGTH | [2023/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN LIQUIDE DE DISPERSION POUR LA MESURE DE LONGUEUR DE FIBRES, MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PRÉPARATION POUR LA MESURE DE LONGUEUR DE FIBRES, MÉTHODE DE MESURE DE LONGUEUR DE FIBRES | [2023/50] |
Former [2020/33] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PRÄPARIERTEN OBJEKTTRÄGERS ZUR FASERLÄNGENMESSUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR ANPASSUNG EINER DISPERSIONSFLÜSSIGKEIT ZUR FASERLÄNGENMESSUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER FASERLÄNGE, PRÄPARIERTER OBJEKTTRÄGER ZUR FASERLÄNGENMESSUNG, VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER FASERLÄNGE UND PROGRAMM ZUR STEUERUNG DER VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER FASERLÄNGE | ||
Former [2020/33] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING PREPARED SLIDE FOR FIBER LENGTH MEASUREMENT, METHOD FOR ADJUSTING DISPERSION LIQUID FOR FIBER LENGTH MEASUREMENT, METHOD FOR MEASURING FIBER LENGTH, PREPARED SLIDE FOR FIBER LENGTH MEASUREMENT, DEVICE FOR MEASURING FIBER LENGTH, AND PROGRAM THAT CONTROLS DEVICE FOR MEASURING FIBER LENGTH | ||
Former [2020/33] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE LAME PRÉPARÉE POUR MESURE DE LA LONGUEUR DE FIBRE, PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE LIQUIDE DE DISPERSION POUR MESURE DE LA LONGUEUR DE FIBRE, PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE LA LONGUEUR DE FIBRE, LAME PRÉPARÉE POUR MESURE DE LA LONGUEUR DE FIBRE, DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE LONGUEUR DE FIBRE, ET PROGRAMME QUI COMMANDE UN DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE LA LONGUEUR DE FIBRE | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2020 | Translation filed | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 17.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 12.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2006008857 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JP2008190909 (JFE ENG KK, et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0030] *; | [A]US2017009201 (HAYASHI HISATO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract * | International search | [YA]JP2005233942 (NIKKISO CO LTD) [Y] 15-17, 19, 21 * , paragraph [0006], fig. 6 (Family: none) * [A] 1-14, 18, 20; | [A]JP2008190909 (JFE ENG KK, et al) [A] 1-21 * , paragraphs [0019]-[0043], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [YA]JP2014000771 (POLYPLASTICS CO) [Y] 19, 21 * , paragraphs [0013], [0038] & WO 2013/190877 A1 * [A] 1-18, 20; | [A]US2015079866 (CHAO YAPING [TH], et al) [A] 1-21* , paragraphs [0056]-[0078] & WO 2013/176033 A1 & EP 2853635 A1 & CN 104114765 A *; | [YA] - SATO, EIJI, "Development of dispersion and length-evaluation methods of vapor- grown carbon fiber", TANSO, (20030101), no. 209, doi:10.7209/tanso.2003.159, pages 159 - 164, XP055683139 [Y] 15-17 [A] 1-14, 18-21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7209/tanso.2003.159 | by applicant | JP2002005924 | - MARIKO TERADAATSUHIKO YAMANAKADAISUKE SHIMAMOTOYUJI HOTTA, 7th Japan Conference on Composite Material (JCCM-7) Preprints, (20160000), vol. 1D-13 |