EP3691665 - A PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A PROBIOTIC AND A PREBIOTIC TO PREVENT ACQUISITION OF OR TREAT DRUG RESISTANT INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chr. Hansen A/S Boege Allé 10-12 2970 Hoersholm / DK | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/48] | For all designated states Chr. Hansen A/S Boege Allé 10-12 2970 Hoersholm / DK | ||
Former [2020/33] | For all designated states Asian Institute of Public Health 28A Unit-6 Ganga Nagar Near Raj Bhawan Bhubaneswar, Orissa 751001 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISRA, Pravas Ranjan Asian Institute Of Public Health Plot No. 2934 Nageswar Tangi Bhubaneswar Odisha 751002 / IN | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2024/17] |
Former [2020/33] | Porta & Consulenti Associati S.p.A. Via Vittoria Colonna, 4 20149 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 18864783.8 | 04.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018IB57720 | Priority number, date | IN201731035103 | 04.10.2017 Original published format: IN201731035103 | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019069266 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3691665 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3691665 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/747, A61K31/702, A61K31/718, A61K45/06, A23L33/125, A23L33/135, A61P31/04 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
A61K35/747 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/125 (EP);
A23L33/135 (EP);
A61K31/702 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/718 (EP);
A61K31/732 (KR);
A61K45/06 (EP,KR);
A61P1/00 (KR);
A61P31/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/702, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/718, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K35/747, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/26] | A61K35/747, A23L33/10, A61P31/04, A61K31/702, A61K31/718, A61K45/06 | ||
Former IPC [2020/33] | A61K35/747 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM PROBIOTIKUM UND EINEM PRÄBIOTIKUM ZUR VERMEIDUNG DES ERWERBS VON ARZNEIMITTELRESISTENTEN INFEKTIONEN | [2020/33] | English: | A PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A PROBIOTIC AND A PREBIOTIC TO PREVENT ACQUISITION OF OR TREAT DRUG RESISTANT INFECTIONS | [2020/33] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT UN PROBIOTIQUE ET UN PRÉBIOTIQUE POUR PRÉVENIR L'ACQUISITION D'INFECTIONS PHARMACORÉSISTANTES OU LES TRAITER | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 14.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24171636.4 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US7101565 (MONTE WOODROW C [NZ]); | [XY]WO2012108830 (LAVIVO AB [SE], et al); |