EP3691536 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE SPATIAL PROBABILITY OF CANCER WITHIN THE PROSTATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENZMANN, Dieter University of California Los Angeles Department of Radiological Sciences Box 957351 924 Westwood Boulevard, Suite 805 Los Angeles, California 90095-7351 / US | 02 /
BROWN, Matthew S. University of California Los Angeles Department of Radiological Sciences Box 957319 924 Westwood Boulevard, Suite 650 Los Angeles, California 90095-7319 / US | 03 /
ARNOLD, Corey W. University of California Los Angeles Department of Radiological Sciences 924 Westwood Boulevard Suite 420 Los Angeles, California 90024 / US | 04 /
NAGARAJAN, Mahesh B. University of California Los Angeles Department of Radiological Sciences Box 957319 924 Westwood Boulevard, Suite 650 Los Angeles, California 90095-7319 / US | 05 /
KIM, Hyun J. University of California Los Angeles Department of Radiological Sciences Box 957319 924 Westwood Boulevard, Suite 615 Los Angeles, California 90095-7319 / US | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 18864794.5 | 02.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018US53898 | Priority number, date | US201762567290P | 03.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762567290 P | [2020/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019070658 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3691536 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/08, G06T11/00, G06T7/35, G06T7/00, G06T7/11, G06T7/136, G06T7/33 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
A61B5/004 (US);
A61B5/055 (US);
A61B5/4381 (US);
A61B5/4887 (US);
G01R33/5602 (US);
G01R33/5608 (US);
G06T11/006 (US);
G06T7/11 (EP);
G06T7/136 (EP);
G06T7/143 (US);
G06T7/33 (EP);
G06T7/337 (US);
G06T7/35 (EP);
A61B8/085 (EP);
G06T2207/10081 (EP);
G06T2207/10088 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10104 (EP);
G06T2207/10108 (EP);
G06T2207/20128 (EP);
G06T2207/30081 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30096 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | A61B8/08, G06T11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER RÄUMLICHEN WAHRSCHEINLICHKEIT VON KREBS INNERHALB DER PROSTATA | [2020/33] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE SPATIAL PROBABILITY OF CANCER WITHIN THE PROSTATE | [2020/33] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE PROBABILITÉ SPATIALE D'UN CANCER DANS LA PROSTATE | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 08.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/09] | 25.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008039723 (SURI JASJIT S [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0009] , [0012] , [0031] - [0033] - [0035] , [0036] , [0039] , [0045] * * figures 2,3,6 *; | [XI] - RUSU MIRABELA ET AL, "Prostatome: A combined anatomical and disease based MRI atlas of the prostate", MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, vol. 41, no. 7, doi:10.1118/1.4881515, ISSN 0094-2405, (20140701), (19010101), XP012186621 [X] 1-8,15 * abstract * * figures 1,4 * * sections 1, 3, 4.A, 4.B, 4.C, 5.A * [I] 9-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.4881515 | [XP] - NAGARAJAN MAHESH B ET AL, "Building a high-resolution T2-weighted MR-based probabilistic model of tumor occurrence in the prostate", ABDOMINAL RADIOLOGY, SPRINGER US, NEW YORK, vol. 43, no. 9, doi:10.1007/S00261-018-1495-2, ISSN 2366-004X, (20180219), pages 2487 - 2496, (20180219), XP036573019 [XP] 1,15 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * section "Materials and methods" and subsections * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00261-018-1495-2 | International search | [YA]US2008039723 (SURI JASJIT S [US], et al) [Y] 1-12, 14-25 * , entire document, especially Abstract; para [0009], [0035]-[0036], [0039], [0045] * [A] 13; | [Y]US2009028397 (MAKRAM-EBEID SHERIF [FR]) [Y] 12, 15 * , entire document, especially Abstract; para [0030]-[0034], [0041]-[0045] *; | [Y]US2009048515 (SURI JASJIT S [US], et al) [Y] 4-6, 8, 11, 14, 17-18 * , entire document, especially Abstract; para [0034], [0037]-[0038], [0041]-[0043], [0054]-[0055] *; | [Y]US2011306043 (FUCHS MARTIN [US], et al) [Y] 9 * , entire document, especially Abstract; para [0088]-[0090], [0333]-[0336], [0460]-[0465] *; | [A]US2012320055 (PEKAR VLADIMIR [CA], et al) [A] 1-25* , entire document *; | [YA]US2016086326 (RASCHKE FELIX [GB], et al) [Y] 1-12, 14-25 * , entire document, especially Abstract; Para [0008], [0082]-[0083], [0096] * [A] 13; | [Y]US2016350946 (SCHIEKE MOIRA F [US], et al) [Y] 19-24 * , entire document, especially Abstract; para [0009], [0013], [0058]-[0060] * | by applicant | - "Prostatome: A combined anatomical and disease based MRI atlas of the prostate", RUSU MIRABELA et al., MEDICAL PHYSICS, AIP, vol. 41 |