EP3693377 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING PEPTIDE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nissan Chemical Corporation 5-1, Nihonbashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-6119 / JP | For all designated states PeptiDream Inc. 3-25-23, Tonomachi Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-0821 / JP | [2020/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAYA, Akihiro c/o Nissan Chemical Corporation Chemical Research Laboratories 10-1 Tsuboi-Nishi 2-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba 274-8507 / JP | 02 /
HANDA, Michiharu c/o Nissan Chemical Corporation Chemical Research Laboratories 10-1 Tsuboi-Nishi 2-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba 274-8507 / JP | 03 /
YASUDA, Naohiko c/o Nissan Chemical Corporation Chemical Research Laboratories 10-1 Tsuboi-Nishi 2-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba 274-8507 / JP | 04 /
YOSHINO, Madoka c/o Nissan Chemical Corporation Chemical Research Laboratories 10-1 Tsuboi-Nishi 2-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba 274-8507 / JP | 05 /
KOBAYASHI, Yutaka c/o PeptiDream Inc. 3-25-23 Tonomachi Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-0821 / JP | 06 /
MASUYA, Keiichi c/o PeptiDream Inc. 3-25-23 Tonomachi Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 210-0821 / JP | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 18864861.2 | 03.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018JP37032 | Priority number, date | JP20170193309 | 03.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017193309 | JP20180134575 | 17.07.2018 Original published format: JP 2018134575 | JP20180180501 | 26.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018180501 | [2020/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019069978 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3693377 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/06 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
C07K1/02 (EP);
C07K1/063 (US);
C07F7/1804 (US);
C07K1/062 (US);
C07K5/0812 (EP,US);
C07K5/1016 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PEPTIDVERBINDUNG | [2020/33] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING PEPTIDE COMPOUND | [2020/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSÉ PEPTIDIQUE | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2020 | Translation filed | 17.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 27.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9305065 (PORTON DEV LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-15 * page 10 - page 11 *; | [A]WO2012087888 (ONYX PHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * compound 18 *; | [A] - BORSUK K ET AL, "Application of substituted 2-(trimethylsilyl)ethyl esters to suppress diketopiperazine formation", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM , NL, vol. 45, no. 18, ISSN 0040-4039, (20040426), pages 3585 - 3588, (20040409), XP027092766 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Scheme 3 * | [A] - MARCO BRANDSTÄTTER ET AL, "Synthesis of 2-Oxazolines by in Situ Desilylation and Cyclodehydration of [beta]-Hydroxyamides", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, Washington, (20141218), vol. 80, no. 1, doi:10.1021/jo5016695, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 40 - 51, XP055590110 [A] 1-15 * Scheme 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo5016695 | [A] - MARTIN STRACK ET AL, "Silyl-Based Alkyne-Modifying Linker for the Preparation of C-Terminal Acetylene-Derivatized Protected Peptides", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, Washington, (20121101), vol. 77, no. 22, doi:10.1021/jo302305d, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 9954 - 9958, XP055590113 [A] 1-15 * Scheme 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo302305d | International search | [A]JPH04502908 [A] 1-27 * & *; | [Y]WO9305065 (PORTON DEV LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-27 * , *; | [Y]JP2014513663 [Y] 1-27 * , *; | [Y] - BORSUK KATARZYNA et al., "Application of substituted 2-(trimethylsilyl)ethyl esters to suppress diketopiperazine formation", Tetrahedron Letters, (20040000), vol. 45, no. 18, doi:10.1016/j.tetlet.2004.03.054, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 3585 - 3588, XP027092766 [Y] 1-27 * , see Abstract, right-hand column of p.3585, Scheme 3 * | [Y] - BRANDSTATTER MARCO et al., "Synthesis of 2-Oxazolines by in Situ Desilylation and Cyclodehydration of beta-Hydroxyamides", J. Org. Chem., (20150000), vol. 80, no. 1, pages 40 - 51, XP055590110 [Y] 1-27 * , see Scheme 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo5016695 | [A] - STRACK MARTIN et al., "Silyl-Based Alkyne-Modifying Linker for the Preparation of C-Terminal Acetylene-Derivatized Protected Peptides", J. Org. Chem., (20120000), vol. 77, no. 22, doi:10.1021/jo302305d, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 9954 - 9958, XP055590113 [A] 1-27 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo302305d | [A] - ISIDRO-LIOBET ALBERT et al., "Amino Acid-Protecting Groups", Chem. Rev., (20090000), vol. 109, doi:doi:10.1021/cr800323s, pages 2455 - 2504, XP055559012 [A] 1-27 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr800323s | by applicant | JPH04502908 | WO9305065 | - Science of Synthesis, (20020000), vol. 4, pages 293 - 303 | - The second series of Pharmaceutical Research and Development, (19910000), vol. 14, pages 3 - 10 |