EP3677456 - ARM FOR AUTOMOBILE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ARM FOR AUTOMOBILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prospira Corporation 580, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki city Kanagawa prefecture 212-0013 / JP | [2022/33] |
Former [2020/28] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA Kanji c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 02 /
KAGA Norihiko c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 03 /
NISHIMURO Yoichi c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 04 /
YAKUSHIJI Gaku c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION 1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/28] | Oxley, Robin John George Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 18864956.0 | 02.10.2018 | [2020/28] | WO2018JP36944 | Priority number, date | JP20170193663 | 03.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017193663 | [2020/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019069951 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3677456 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60G7/00, B29C45/14, B29C69/00, B29C70/08, B29C70/12 | [2020/28] | CPC: |
B60G7/001 (EP);
B60G7/00 (EP,US);
B29C45/0001 (US);
B29C45/14 (EP,US);
B29C69/00 (EP);
B29C70/08 (EP);
B29C70/12 (EP);
B29K2101/12 (US);
B29K2105/12 (US);
B29L2031/30 (US);
B60G2206/014 (EP);
B60G2206/7101 (EP);
B60G2206/7104 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | ARM FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ARMS FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2020/28] | English: | ARM FOR AUTOMOBILE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ARM FOR AUTOMOBILE | [2020/28] | French: | BRAS POUR VOITURE DE TOURISME ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2020 | Translation filed | 31.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 26.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6076409 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * , page 2, upper left column, line 17 to page 3, lower right column, line 19, fig. 1-4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH05269785 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0006]-[0016], [0021] (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH10272707 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0018]-[0024], fig. 1-2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012139834 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0003], [0007]-[0014] (Family: none) *; | [A]DE102013214673 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0004]-[0007], fig. 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2016075333 (THK RHYTHM CO LTD) [Y] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0032]-[0048], fig. 1-2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2017110322 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) [A] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0010]-[0018], [0037]-[0038] (Family: none) *; | [EA]JP2018176916 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [EA] 1-8* , paragraphs [0024]-[0047], fig. 1-6 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2001105090 |