EP3640309 - ANTI-SETTLING AGENT COMPOSITION FOR AQUEOUS COATING MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kusumoto Chemicals, Ltd. 11-13 Uchikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0047 / JP | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UBUKATA, Makoto c/o KUSUMOTO CHEMICALS LTD. 18-6 Benten 4-chome Soka-shi Saitama 340-0004 / JP | 02 /
NISHIYAMA, Hironori c/o KUSUMOTO CHEMICALS LTD. 18-6 Benten 4-chome Soka-shi Saitama 340-0004 / JP | 03 /
SAITO, Toshiki c/o KUSUMOTO CHEMICALS LTD. 18-6 Benten 4-chome Soka-shi Saitama 340-0004 / JP | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18867736.3 | 19.10.2018 | [2020/17] | WO2018JP39016 | Priority number, date | JP20170204061 | 20.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017204061 | [2020/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019078360 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3640309 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3640309 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09D201/00, C09D5/02, C09D7/45, C09D177/00, C08G69/34, C08L77/08, C08K5/092, C08K5/05, C09D177/08 | [2021/11] | CPC: |
C08G69/34 (EP);
C09D7/45 (EP,KR,US);
C09D177/06 (US);
C08G69/26 (US);
C08G69/265 (US);
C08K5/01 (KR);
C08K5/05 (EP,US);
C08K5/09 (EP);
C08L77/00 (KR);
C08L77/08 (EP);
C09D177/08 (EP);
C09D201/00 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/05, C08L77/08 (EP);
C08K5/09, C08L77/08 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/17] | C09D201/00, C09D5/02, C09D7/45, C09D177/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIABSETZMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR WÄSSRIGE BESCHICHTUNGSMATERIALIEN | [2020/17] | English: | ANTI-SETTLING AGENT COMPOSITION FOR AQUEOUS COATING MATERIALS | [2020/17] | French: | COMPOSITION D'AGENT ANTI-SÉDIMENTATION POUR MATÉRIAUX DE REVÊTEMENT AQUEUX | [2020/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2020 | Translation filed | 13.01.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2020 | Examination requested [2020/17] | 14.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2023 | CZ | 29.03.2023 | DK | 29.03.2023 | EE | 29.03.2023 | FI | 29.03.2023 | HR | 29.03.2023 | LT | 29.03.2023 | LV | 29.03.2023 | MC | 29.03.2023 | NL | 29.03.2023 | PL | 29.03.2023 | RO | 29.03.2023 | RS | 29.03.2023 | SE | 29.03.2023 | SI | 29.03.2023 | SK | 29.03.2023 | SM | 29.03.2023 | NO | 29.06.2023 | GR | 30.06.2023 | IS | 29.07.2023 | PT | 31.07.2023 | LU | 19.10.2023 | [2024/30] |
Former [2024/28] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
MC | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SI | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
CZ | 29.03.2023 | ||
DK | 29.03.2023 | ||
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
PL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SK | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
IS | 29.07.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RO | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 29.03.2023 | |
EE | 29.03.2023 | ||
FI | 29.03.2023 | ||
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
SM | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
PT | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
NL | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
GR | 30.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 29.03.2023 | |
HR | 29.03.2023 | ||
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
LV | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
SE | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 29.03.2023 | |
LT | 29.03.2023 | ||
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
NO | 29.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 29.03.2023 | |
RS | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 29.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH10310726 (KUSUMOTO CHEMICALS) [A] 1-7 * , entire text & US 5994494 A, entire text & EP 877063 A2 *; | [A]JP2005171155 (ITOH OIL MFG) [A] 1-7* , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008266448 (ITOH OIL MFG) [A] 1-7 * , claims, paragraphs [0005], [0030]-[0039], examples (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012111832 (KUSUMOTO CHEMICALS) [A] 1-7 * , claims, paragraphs [0001], [0025], examples & US 2012/0125235 A1, claims, paragraphs [0001], [0033], examples & EP 2457961 A1 * |