EP3627536 - SUSCEPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Techno-Carbon Co., Ltd. 62-6 Aza-Nakasoneyama Kawauchi Osato-cho Kurokawa-gun Miyagi 981-3514 / JP | [2020/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUBO Shuichi c/o Nippon Techno-Carbon Co. Ltd. 62-6 Aza-Nakasoneyama Kawauchi Osato-cho Kurokawa-gun Miyagi 981-3514 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI Hikari c/o Nippon Techno-Carbon Co. Ltd. 62-6 Aza-Nakasoneyama Kawauchi Osato-cho Kurokawa-gun Miyagi 981-3514 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI Toshiya c/o Nippon Techno-Carbon Co. Ltd. 62-6 Aza-Nakasoneyama Kawauchi Osato-cho Kurokawa-gun Miyagi 981-3514 / JP | 04 /
USUBA Hidehiko c/o Nippon Techno-Carbon Co. Ltd. 62-6 Aza-Nakasoneyama Kawauchi Osato-cho Kurokawa-gun Miyagi 981-3514 / JP | [2020/13] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18868072.2 | 05.10.2018 | [2020/13] | WO2018JP37342 | Priority number, date | JP20170201582 | 18.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017201582 | [2020/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019078036 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3627536 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3627536 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/205, C01B32/21, C23C16/42, C23C16/46, H01L21/683 | [2020/13] | CPC: |
H01L21/68757 (EP,US);
H01L21/683 (KR);
C23C16/46 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/21 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/325 (US);
C23C16/342 (US);
C23C16/42 (KR);
C23C16/4581 (EP);
C23C16/4583 (US);
C23C16/4584 (EP);
C23C16/4586 (EP);
C30B25/12 (US);
C30B29/403 (US);
H01L21/67103 (EP,US);
H01L21/67115 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUSZEPTOR | [2020/13] | English: | SUSCEPTOR | [2020/13] | French: | SUSCEPTEUR | [2020/13] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.2019 | Translation filed | 17.12.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.12.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 17.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/13] | 07.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.04.2023
27.04.2023
ADMISSIBLE SGL Carbon SE Söhnleinstrasse 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/22] | 16.05.2023 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.09.2023 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.09.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2018 | AL | 27.07.2022 | AT | 27.07.2022 | CY | 27.07.2022 | CZ | 27.07.2022 | DK | 27.07.2022 | EE | 27.07.2022 | ES | 27.07.2022 | FI | 27.07.2022 | HR | 27.07.2022 | LT | 27.07.2022 | LV | 27.07.2022 | MC | 27.07.2022 | MK | 27.07.2022 | NL | 27.07.2022 | PL | 27.07.2022 | RO | 27.07.2022 | RS | 27.07.2022 | SE | 27.07.2022 | SI | 27.07.2022 | SK | 27.07.2022 | SM | 27.07.2022 | IE | 05.10.2022 | LU | 05.10.2022 | NO | 27.10.2022 | GR | 28.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | IS | 27.11.2022 | PT | 28.11.2022 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/21] | HU | 05.10.2018 | |
AL | 27.07.2022 | ||
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CY | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
IE | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 05.10.2018 | |
AL | 27.07.2022 | ||
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
IE | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
IE | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
LU | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SI | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
LU | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
LU | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
LU | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 27.07.2022 | |
AT | 27.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
MC | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
EE | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SK | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 27.07.2022 | |
CZ | 27.07.2022 | ||
DK | 27.07.2022 | ||
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RO | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 27.07.2022 | |
ES | 27.07.2022 | ||
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
SM | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
IS | 27.11.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
PL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
HR | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
GR | 28.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
LV | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
PT | 28.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 27.07.2022 | |
FI | 27.07.2022 | ||
LT | 27.07.2022 | ||
NL | 27.07.2022 | ||
RS | 27.07.2022 | ||
SE | 27.07.2022 | ||
NO | 27.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | NL | 27.07.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0235570 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO [JP]) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [Y]JPH07165467 (TOKAI CARBON KK) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2001031473 (TOYO TANSO CO) [A] 1,2 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]US6740167 (RUPP ROLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 4, paragraph 5 - column 43, paragraph 16; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP1790757 (TOYO TANSO CO [JP]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]KR20090125347 (TOKAI CARBON KOREA CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1,2 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]US2015206785 (MIYASHITA MASAHITO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0067]; claims 1-6 *; | [A]CN106948002 (NANJING GUOSHENG ELECTRONIC CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPH07165467 (TOKAI CARBON KK) [Y] 1, 2 * , *; | [Y]JP2001031473 (TOYO TANSO CO) [Y] 1, 2 * , *; | [Y]JP2016012679 (TOYODA GOSEI KK) [Y] 1, 2 * , *; | [Y]JP2017103190 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1, 2 * , *; | [PA]JP2018145079 (COORSTEK KK) [PA] 1, 2* , * | by applicant | JP2004281863 | - TANSO, (20150000), pages 166 - 170 | Opposition | JPH07165467 | US2002166503 | JP2004200436 | JP5110464B | - D. J. Page, "Chapter One: THE MANUFACTURE OF CARBON AND GRAPHITE", THE INDUSTRIAL GRAPHITE ENGINEERING HANDBOOK, USA, UCAR, (20010101), pages 1 - 1-14, XP009554081 | - D. J. Page, "Chapter Four: THERMAL PROPERTIES", THE INDUSTRIAL GRAPHITE ENGINEERING HANDBOOK, USA, UCAR, (20010101), pages 4 - 4-22, XP009554083 | - D. J. Page, "Chapter Five: ELECTRICAL PROPERTIES", THE INDUSTRIAL GRAPHITE ENGINEERING HANDBOOK, USA, UCAR, (20010101), pages 5 - 5-10, XP009554084 | - D. J. Page, "Glossary & Bibliography: THE INDUSTRIAL GRAPHITE ENGINEERING HANDBOOK", THE INDUSTRIAL GRAPHITE ENGINEERING HANDBOOK, USA, UCAR, (20010101), pages G - G-7, B-1 - B2, XP009554087 | - D. J. Page, "Chapter Seven: INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS OF BULK CARBON AND GRAPHITE", THE INDUSTRIAL GRAPHITE ENGINEERING HANDBOOK, USA, UCAR, (20010101), pages 7 - 7-8, XP009554086 | - D. J. Page, "Chapter Six: CHEMICAL PROPERTIES", THE INDUSTRIAL GRAPHITE ENGINEERING HANDBOOK, USA, UCAR, (20010101), pages 6 - 6-11, XP009554085 | - D. J. Page, "Chapter Three: MECHANICAL PROPERTIES", THE INDUSTRIAL GRAPHITE ENGINEERING HANDBOOK, USA, UCAR, (20010101), pages 3 - 3-27, XP009554082 | - D. J. Page, "Chapter Two: TYPICAL GRADES AND ROOM TEMPERATURE PROPERTIES", THE INDUSTRIAL GRAPHITE ENGINEERING HANDBOOK, USA, UCAR, (20010101), pages 2 - 2-10, XP009554080 | - Yoshimoto Osamu; Okada Masaki; Ohta Naoto, "Apparatus for measuring the relative electrical resistivity of graphite materials at high temperatures by direct heating", Carbon, Elsevier Oxford, GB, GB , (19000101), vol. 93, doi:10.1016/j.carbon.2015.07.023, ISSN 0008-6223, page 1080, XP029255477 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carbon.2015.07.023 | - Anonymous, "SIGRAFINE® R6340 - Material data", SGL Group, (20150801), SGL Group, XP093152922 | - Reed O. Elliott, "Thermal Expansion of Some Transition Metal Carbides", J. Phys. Chem., (19580101), vol. 62, no. 5, doi:10.1021/j150563a030, pages 630 - 631, XP093152947 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/j150563a030 | - Z. Li, "Thermal expansion of the cubic (3C) polytype of SiC", Journal of Material Science, Kluwer Academic Publishers, Dordrecht, Dordrecht , (19861201), vol. 21, no. 12, doi:10.1007/BF01106557, ISSN 0022-2461, pages 4366 - 4368, XP093152933 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01106557 | - Masashi Nakabayashi, "Precise Determination of Thermal Expansion Coefficients Observed in 4H-SiC Single Crystals", MATERIALS SCIENCE FORUM, Trans Tech Publications Ltd, CH, CH , vol. 527-529, doi:10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.527-529.699, ISSN 1662-9752, pages 699 - 702, XP093152937 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.527-529.699 | - Matthias Stockmeier, "Thermal Expansion Coefficients of 6H Silicon Carbide", MATERIALS SCIENCE FORUM, Trans Tech Publications Ltd, CH, CH , vol. 600-603, doi:10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.600-603.517, ISSN 1662-9752, pages 517 - 520, XP093152941 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4028/www.scientific.net/MSF.600-603.517 |