EP3699248 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | For all designated states DIC Corporation 35-58, Sakashita 3-chome Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8520 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKIYAMA Seiji c/o DIC Corporation Saitama Plant 4472-1 Oaza Komuro, Ina-machi Kitaadachi-gun Saitama 362-8577 / JP | 02 /
MORINO Akinori c/o DIC Corporation Saitama Plant 4472-1 Oaza Komuro, Ina-machi Kitaadachi-gun Saitama 362-8577 / JP | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2020/35] | Application number, filing date | 18868149.8 | 19.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018JP38970 | Priority number, date | JP20170203544 | 20.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017203544 | WO2018JP37177 | 04.10.2018 Original published format: PCT/JP2018/037177 | [2020/35] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019078347 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3699248 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C09J5/00, B32B37/12, C09J7/38, C09J201/00 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
C09J5/00 (EP);
C08J5/124 (EP);
B32B37/12 (EP);
C09J2203/318 (EP);
C09J2301/124 (EP);
C09J2453/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ARTIKELS | [2020/35] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ARTICLE | [2020/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE DES ARTICLES | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2020 | Translation filed | 02.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 15.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/18] | 14.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5032438 (SAKUMOTO YUKINORI [JP], et al) [X] 5* column 1, lines 9-19; examples 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [I]WO9400525 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [I] 1-4 * page 7, lines 11-18; figures 1,6,7; examples 1-15; claims 1-7; tables II,III * * page 19, line 28 - page 20, line 2 * | International search | [XY]JP2001279200 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * , * [Y] 4-5; | [Y]JP2003292913 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 4-5 * , *; | [Y]JP2009007532 (NITTO SHINKO KK) [Y] 5 * , *; | [A]JP2002121503 (THREE M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES) [A] 1-5; | [A]JP2005048070 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 1-5 * , *; | [A]JP2004051708 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * , *; | [A]JPH07310057 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 1-5 * , *; | [PA]JP2018008419 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS) [PA] 1-5 * , * | by applicant | JP2001152111 |