EP3697453 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PHOTOELECTROCHEMICAL AIR PURIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2023 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Molekule, Inc. 1301 Folsom Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOSWAMI, Dilip 1184 Harrison St. San Francisco CA 94103 / US | 02 /
MYERS, Philip 1184 Harrison St. San Francisco CA 94103 / US | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | Higgs, Jonathan Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Altius House 1 North Fourth Street Milton Keynes MK9 1DG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18869295.8 | 16.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018US56061 | Priority number, date | US201762573624P | 17.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762573624 P | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019079281 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3697453 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.04.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/02, A61L2/08, A61L9/00 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
B01J21/063 (EP,KR,US);
F24F8/192 (EP,KR,US);
A61L9/205 (US);
A61L9/22 (US);
B01J21/185 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/39 (EP,KR,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,KR,US);
F24F8/10 (US);
F24F8/167 (EP,KR,US);
F24F8/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2209/14 (US);
A61L2209/15 (US);
A61L2209/21 (US);
B01J2208/026 (US);
B01J2219/248 (US);
B82Y40/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR PHOTOELEKTROCHEMISCHEN LUFTREINIGUNG | [2020/35] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PHOTOELECTROCHEMICAL AIR PURIFICATION | [2020/35] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE PURIFICATION D'AIR PAR VOIE PHOTOÉLECTROCHIMIQUE | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 08.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   15.11.2022 | 31.10.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004108255 (CARRIER CORP [US]) [X] 1-15* figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO2016020115 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-15 * pages 1-15; figure -; example - * | International search | [A]US4065276 (NAKAYA AKIRA, et al) [A] 19 * Abstract, col 1 In 39-43, col 1 In 49-51, Figure 2 *; | [A]US2005061656 (BENOIT JEFFREY T [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * Entire Document *; | [A]US2008112845 (DUNN CHARLES E [US], et al) [A] 1-20* Entire Document *; | [A]US2009002985 (PECK JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 5-6 * Abstract, Figure 1. *; | [YA]US2009175757 (YAO YUAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 7, 11-15, 16-18, 20 * Abstract, para [0007]-[0009], [0021], [0033], [0062], [0066], Figures 1A-1C. * [A] 5-6, 8-10, 19; | [A]US2009245594 (ABRAMOVICH GIL [US], et al) [A] 1, 4, 11 * para [0028]. *; | [A]US2015008014 (ZHOU FEI [CN], et al) [A] 8-10 * para [0007], [0038], [0054], Figure 2. *; | [YA]US2015320900 (GOSWAMI DILIP [US], et al) [Y] 1-4, 7, 11-15, 16-18, 20 * Abstract, para [0013], [0022], [0030]-[0032], [0034], [0036], [0039], [0047], Figure 1, Figure 4. * [A] 5-6, 8-10, 19; | [Y] - HOU et al., "A review of surface plasmon resonance-enhanced photocatalysis", Advanced Functional Materials, (20130405), vol. 23, no. 13, doi:doi:10.1002/adfm.201202148, pages 1612 - 1619, XP001582432 [Y] 4, 15 * . pg 1 col 2 para 1, pg 2 col 1 para 2. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adfm.201202148 | by applicant | US200917 | US2015320900 | - HOU et al., "A review of surface plasmon resonance-enhanced photocatalysis", Advanced Functional Materials, vol. 23, no. 13, doi:10.1002/adfm.201202148, pages 1612 - 1619, XP001582432 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adfm.201202148 |