EP3728801 - BOTTOMING CYCLE POWER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scuderi Group, Inc. 1111 Elm Street, Suite 33 West Springfield, MA 01089 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCUDERI, Salvatore 108 Sunset Drive Westfield MA 01085 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Arnason Faktor Intellectual Property Consulting Gudridarstig 2-4 113 Reykjavik / IS | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Arnason Faktor Intellectual Property Consulting Gudridarstig 2-4 113 Reykjavik / IS | Application number, filing date | 18870699.8 | 24.10.2018 | [2020/44] | WO2018US57411 | Priority number, date | US201762576964P | 25.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762576964 P | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019084208 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3728801 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3728801 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01N5/04, F02B35/00, F01K23/00, F02C1/00, F02C3/00, F02C6/00, F02B63/04, F01K9/00, F01K23/06, F01K23/10, F01K19/04, F02G5/02, F25B15/06, F25B25/02, F25B27/02 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
F01K9/003 (EP,US);
F02B39/085 (US);
F01K19/04 (EP,US);
F01K23/065 (EP);
F01N3/005 (EP);
F01N5/04 (EP);
F02B35/00 (EP);
F02B41/10 (US);
F02B63/042 (EP);
F02C6/006 (EP,US);
F25B15/06 (EP);
F25B25/02 (EP);
F25B27/02 (EP);
F01N2240/22 (EP);
F02G5/02 (EP,US);
F05D2220/764 (EP,US);
F05D2260/10 (EP,US);
Y02A30/274 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | F01N5/04, F02B35/00, F01K23/00, F02C1/00, F02C3/00, F02C6/00, F02G5/00, F02B63/04, F01K9/00, F01K23/06, F01K23/10 | ||
Former IPC [2020/44] | F01K23/00, F02C1/00, F02C3/00, F02C6/00, F02G5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR BOTTOMING CYCLE | [2020/44] | English: | BOTTOMING CYCLE POWER SYSTEM | [2020/44] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION DE CYCLE DE RÉCUPÉRATION | [2020/44] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/44] | 22.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2020/44] | 19.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/44] | 07.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/12] | Request for further processing for: | 19.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 19.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 19.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 19.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 19.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 19.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.04.2023 | AT | 12.04.2023 | CZ | 12.04.2023 | DK | 12.04.2023 | EE | 12.04.2023 | ES | 12.04.2023 | FI | 12.04.2023 | HR | 12.04.2023 | IT | 12.04.2023 | LT | 12.04.2023 | LV | 12.04.2023 | MC | 12.04.2023 | NL | 12.04.2023 | PL | 12.04.2023 | RO | 12.04.2023 | RS | 12.04.2023 | SE | 12.04.2023 | SI | 12.04.2023 | SK | 12.04.2023 | SM | 12.04.2023 | NO | 12.07.2023 | GR | 13.07.2023 | IS | 12.08.2023 | PT | 14.08.2023 | LU | 24.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
LU | 24.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
LU | 24.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
MC | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
IT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SI | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2023 | ||
DK | 12.04.2023 | ||
EE | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RO | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
SK | 12.04.2023 | ||
SM | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
FI | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
LT | 12.04.2023 | ||
LV | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
HR | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
RS | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 12.04.2023 | |
AT | 12.04.2023 | ||
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
GR | 13.07.2023 | ||
IS | 12.08.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 12.04.2023 | |
ES | 12.04.2023 | ||
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
SE | 12.04.2023 | ||
NO | 12.07.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 12.04.2023 | |
NL | 12.04.2023 | ||
PT | 14.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 12.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH701133 (SCHMID W AG [CH]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]GB2501458 (BOWMAN POWER GROUP LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2017098251 (HIETA TECH LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US2003000213 (CHRISTENSEN RICHARD N [US], et al) [Y] 6 * , entire document, especially para [0175] *; | [A]US2011088399 (BRIESCH MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US2015000249 (CARRONI RICHARD [CH], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2016109138 (KANG MIN CHEOL [KR], et al) [Y] 1-20 * , entire document, especially Fig. 2, paras [0036]-[0041] *; | [A]US9410451 (LAING DONALD GORDON [US], et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document *; | [Y]WO2017098251 (HIETA TECH LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [Y] - "Internal combustion engine", WIKIPEDIA, (20170721), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Internal_combustion_engine, XP055596149 [Y] 18 * , entire document * | by applicant | GB2501458 |