EP3700533 - SSTR-TARGETED CONJUGATES AND FORMULATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TVA (ABC), LLC 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2022/26] |
Former [2020/36] | For all designated states Tarveda Therapeutics, Inc. 134 Coolidge Avenue Watertown, MA 02472 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINDE, Rajesh R. One Carmel Circle Lexington Massachusetts 02421 / US | 02 /
ALARGOVA, Rossitza G. 148 Newton St. Apt.4 Brighton Massachusetts 02135 / US | 03 /
LIM SOO, Patrick 64 Garfield Place Unit B Ridgewood New Jersey 07450 / US | 04 /
SWERYDA-KRAWIEC, Beata 46 Littlefield Lane Marlborough Massachusetts 01752 / US | 05 /
ALLAND, Leila 102 Carriage House Rd Bernardsville New Jersey 07924 / US | 06 /
SEARS, Christopher 3 Leslie Rd. Belmont Massachusetts 02478 / US | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 18870791.3 | 26.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018US57673 | Priority number, date | US201762577897P | 27.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762577897 P | US201862679230P | 01.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862679230 P | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019084377 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3700533 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/535, A61K47/55, A61K47/64, A61P35/00 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/5386 (US);
A61K31/535 (EP);
A61K47/54 (US);
A61K47/64 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | A61K31/535, A61K47/55, A61K47/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Title | German: | GEGEN SSTR GERICHTETE KONJUGATE UND FORMULIERUNGEN DAVON | [2020/36] | English: | SSTR-TARGETED CONJUGATES AND FORMULATIONS THEREOF | [2020/36] | French: | CONJUGUÉS CIBLANT SSTR ET FORMULATIONS DE CES DERNIERS | [2020/36] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2020 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 30.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 17.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2017095569 (ALARGOVA ROSSITZA G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,11,12 * Paragraph [0006], [0299];; claims 1-12 *[I] 3-10; | [XI]WO2017075495 (TARVEDA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,11,12 * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0140]; examples 7-10; claims 1-61 * * paragraph [0254] * * paragraph [0162] * [I] 3-10 | International search | [A]WO2016004048 (BLEND THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1-12* Entire Document *; | [XY]WO2017075495 (TARVEDA THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-7, 10-12 * para [0009]-[0010], [0121], [0140], [0162], [0220], [0225]-[0227], [0254], [0342] * [Y] 8-9; | [Y] - KWEKKEBOOM et al., "Treatment of patients with gastro-entero-pancreatic (GEP) tumours with the novel radiolabelled somatostatin analogue [177Lu-DOTAO,Tyr3]octreotate", European Journal of Nuclear Medicine and Molecular Imaging, (20030000), vol. 30, no. 3, doi:10.1007/s00259-002-1050-8, ISSN 1619-7070, pages 417 - 422, XP055595384 [Y] 8 * . abstract; pg 420, col 2, para 2; pg 421, Fig 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00259-002-1050-8 | [Y] - BURGHUBER et al., "Serum Neuron-Specific Enolase Is a Useful Tumor Marker for Small Cell Lung Cancer", Cancer, (19900000), vol. 65, doi:10.1002/1097-0142(19900315)65:6<1386::AID-CNCR2820650623>3.0.CO;2-9, ISBN 0008-543X, pages 1386 - 1390, XP055595388 [Y] 9 * . abstract; pg 1388, Fig 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-0142(19900315)65:6<1386::AID-CNCR2820650623>3.0.CO;2-9 |